Zavolta v. Pan Pennsylvania LLC

Plaintiff: Ronald W. Zavolta
Defendant: Pan Pennsylvania LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00005
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Buck on behalf of Pan Pennsylvania LLC (Buck, Thomas)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings/Joinder of Parties due by 5/15/2019. Discovery due by 9/6/2019. Motions due by 1/22/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/24/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/1/2020 02:00 PM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, North before District Judge John Preston Bailey. Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 6/9/2020 08:30 AM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, North before District Judge John Preston Bailey. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 3/5/19. (soa)
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Scheduling Order Worksheet)(Baldwin, Michelle)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER -- FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 2/18/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/4/2019. Initial Discovery Disclosures due by 4/18/2019. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 1/17/19. (soa)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pan Pennsylvania LLC. (Baldwin, Michelle) (Main Document 4 replaced on 1/16/2019) (soa). Modified on 1/16/2019 to make document a non-fillable PDF (soa).
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Pan Pennsylvania LLC.(Baldwin, Michelle)
January 15, 2019 District Judge John Preston Bailey added. Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. no longer assigned to case, due to initial incorrect assignment. (soa)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION re #1 Notice of Removal, mailed by US mail to attorney Ratcliffe. (soa)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Ohio County, WV, (case number 18-C-284). Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #0424-2739225, filed by Pan Pennsylvania LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons/Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Stipulation to Amend, #3 Exhibit 3 - email, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(soa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zavolta v. Pan Pennsylvania LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald W. Zavolta
Represented By: Paul J. Ratcliffe
Represented By: Jordan M. Laird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pan Pennsylvania LLC
Represented By: Michelle D. Baldwin
Represented By: Nancy R. Winschel
Represented By: Thomas E. Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?