Dean v. Entzel et al

Plaintiff: Todd Glenn Dean
Defendant: Chaplain Supervisory Chaplain, Chaplain Fuentes, F. Entzel, Chaplain Maria and Unknown Agents
Case Number: 5:2019cv00014
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: James P Mazzone
Referring Judge: Frederick P Stamp
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone no longer assigned to case pursuant to #8 Report and Recommendation. (lmm)
April 1, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. It is recommended that Plaintiff's #1 complaint be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for the failure to exhaust. It is further recommended that the #7 Motion to Appoint Counsel be DENIED AS MOOT. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the Magistrate Judge association with this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 4/12/19. (Pro Se Plaintiff via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/1/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
March 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Todd Glenn Dean. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmm)
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 INCORRECT IMAGE DELETED. (Main Document 6 replaced on 2/7/2019 to delete incorrect document) (lmm).
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. (Pro Se Plaintiff via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/7/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
February 7, 2019 Filing 4 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Todd Glenn Dean. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/7/2019: #2 Ledger Sheets) (lmm).
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Todd Glenn Dean. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmm)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Todd Glenn Dean. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Todd Glenn Dean, #2 Envelope)(lmm) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/7/2019 to add correct document) (lmm).
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Todd Glenn Dean. (Attachments: #1 6/22/18 - Notice of Appeal, #2 List of citations, #3 Table of Contents, #4 Exhibit A - 2/3/14 Request for Administrative Remedy, #5 Exhibit B - Inmate Request to Staff, #6 Exhibit C - Request for Administrative Remedy, #7 Exhibit D - Letter, #8 Exhibit E - Specific Complaint, #9 6/22/18 Letter, #10 6/26/18 Letter, #11 Envelope)(lmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dean v. Entzel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chaplain Supervisory Chaplain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chaplain Fuentes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Entzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chaplain Maria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Agents
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Glenn Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?