Gorby v. Highmark West Virginia, Inc.
Plaintiff: Deborah Gorby
Defendant: Highmark West Virginia, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00018
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings/Joinder of Parties due by 5/14/2019. Discovery due by 11/27/2019. Motions due by 12/30/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/24/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/2/2020 02:00 PM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, North before District Judge John Preston Bailey. Bench Trial set for 3/10/2020 08:30 AM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, North before District Judge John Preston Bailey. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 4/2/19. (soa)
April 1, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hall, Jill)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Highmark West Virginia, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Highmark Health, Corporate Parent Highmark Inc. for Highmark West Virginia, Inc... (Hall, Jill)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Highmark West Virginia, Inc..(Hall, Jill)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER -- FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 3/25/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/8/2019. Initial Discovery Disclosures due by 4/25/2019. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 2/25/19. (soa)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Ohio County, WV, (case number 19-C-20). Filing Fee $400. Receipt #0424-2762756, filed by Highmark West Virginia, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint/Summons, #2 Exhibit B - State Court docket, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing NOR, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(soa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gorby v. Highmark West Virginia, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Gorby
Represented By: Scott H. Kaminski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highmark West Virginia, Inc.
Represented By: Mark H. Dellinger
Represented By: Jill E. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?