Mey v. Castle Law Group, PC et al

Plaintiff: Diana Mey
Defendant: Judson Phillips, Bruyette and Associates, LLC and Castle Law Group, PC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00185
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Frederick P Stamp
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINES FOR DISCOVERY REPORT AND INITIAL DISCLOSURES: Granting #10 Motion To extend deadlines; Meeting Report, Proposed discovery plan, and Initial Discovery Disclosures due by 8/2/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 7/8/19. (soa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/8/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (soa).
July 5, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT MOTION To Extend Deadlines re #4 First Order, by Diana Mey, Judson Phillips. (soa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/5/2019: #1 Cover letter, #2 Envelope) (soa). Modified on 7/5/2019 to regenerate NEF (soa).
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Diana Mey. (Barrett, John)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 Mail sent to Judson Phillips #2 Filing Fee Received and #3 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT Returned as Undeliverable; Return to Sender; Unclaimed; Unable to Forward. (nmm)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION, by Judson Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter, #2 Envelope)(soa)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 ORDER -- FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 6/6/2019. (nmm)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFIED STATE COURT RECORD from Circuit Court of Ohio Co., WV (Part 1) (soa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/6/2019: #1 Part 2, #2 Notice of Filing, #3 Envelope) (soa). Modified on 6/6/2019 to regenerate NEF. (soa).
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER -- FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 7/2/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/9/2019. Initial Discovery Disclosues due by 7/16/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 5/30/19. (copy by cert. mail to Def. Phillips)(soa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/30/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (soa).
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT re #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Def. Phillips by cert. mail, together with copy of #2 Receipt. (soa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/29/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (soa).
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number WVNC002612. (soa)(copy to Pro Se Def., Phillips) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/29/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (soa).
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circut Court of Ohio County, WV, (case number 19-C-31), filed by Judson Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court papers, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing NOR, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Envelope)(soa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mey v. Castle Law Group, PC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judson Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruyette and Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Castle Law Group, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Mey
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Represented By: Jonathan R Marshall
Represented By: Sharon F. Iskra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?