LONGO et al v. WHEELING HOSPITAL, INC. et al
Plaintiff: Louis Longo and United States of America
Defendant: R&V ASSOCIATES, LTD., Wheeling Hospital, Inc. and RONALD L. VIOLI
Petitioner: Adam Tune
Case Number: 5:2019cv00192
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Office: Wheeling Office
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3729
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER OF COURT granting #177 Motion to Withdraw. Motions terminated: #160 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Adam Tune. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 10/4/19. (lmm)
October 3, 2019 Filing 178 TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER by United States of America for proceedings held on 9/20/2019 before Judge Bailey. (ck)
October 3, 2019 Filing 177 MOTION to Withdraw #160 MOTION for Protective Order by Adam Tune. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dietrich, Danielle)
October 3, 2019 Filing 176 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by R&V ASSOCIATES, LTD. of Second Set of Request for Production to Plaintiff. (Wilson, Kristen)
October 3, 2019 Filing 175 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by R&V ASSOCIATES, LTD. for Second Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff. (Wilson, Kristen)
October 2, 2019 Filing 174 Defendant Ronald L. Violi's ANSWER to #19 Intervenor Complaint by RONALD L. VIOLI.(Wilson, Kristen)
October 2, 2019 Filing 173 R&V Associates, LTD ANSWER to #19 Intervenor Complaint by R&V ASSOCIATES, LTD..(Wilson, Kristen)
October 2, 2019 Filing 172 Defendant Wheeling Hospital's ANSWER to #19 Intervenor Complaint by Wheeling Hospital, Inc..(Chernenko, Marc)
October 2, 2019 Filing 171 TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER by R&V ASSOCIATES, LTD. for proceedings held on 9/20/2019 before Judge Bailey. (ck)
October 2, 2019 Filing 170 *SEALED* TRANSCRIPT of Sealed Hearing held on 9/20/2019, before Judge Bailey. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cindy Knecht, Telephone number 304.234.3968.. (ck)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 10/1/19. (lmm)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER DENYING EMERGENCY 163 MOTION TO MODIFY COURT ORDER. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 10/1/19. (lmm) Modified on 10/1/2019 to unseal and REGEN NEF (lmm).
October 1, 2019 Filing 166 RESPONSE in Opposition re #160 MOTION for Protective Order for Dr. Adam Tune filed by R&V ASSOCIATES, LTD.. (Wilson, Kristen)
September 30, 2019 Filing 164 Memorandum in Opposition re #132 MOTION to Withdraw Motion for Leave to File Protective Order Under Seal and Accompanying Memorandum in Opposition to Violi Motion (159) to Modify Order (84) filed by United States of America. (Kinskey, Greg)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting 159 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 9/30/19. (lmm)
September 27, 2019 Filing 161 Exhibit A to Motion for Protective Order Other Document re #160 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Adam Tune. (Dietrich, Danielle)
September 27, 2019 Filing 160 MOTION for Protective Order by Adam Tune. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dietrich, Danielle)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 158 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 9/25/19. (soa)
September 24, 2019 Filing 157 STIPULATION to Enter Protective Order by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kinskey, Greg)
September 23, 2019 Filing 156 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America of its Objections and Responses to R&Vs 1st Set of Interrogatories and 1st Set of Requests for Production of Documents. (Kinskey, Greg)
September 23, 2019 Filing 155 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wheeling Hospital, Inc. Responses/Objections to United States' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents (Chernenko, Marc)
September 23, 2019 Filing 154 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wheeling Hospital, Inc. Answer/Objection to United States' First Interrogatory (Chernenko, Marc)
September 23, 2019 Filing 153 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by R&V ASSOCIATES, LTD. for Responses and OBjections to the United States' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents. (Wilson, Kristen)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 9/23/19. (lmm)
September 20, 2019 Filing 151 Exhibit List of #150 Evidentiary Hearing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Plaintiff's No. 1)(soa)
September 20, 2019 Filing 150 MINUTE ENTRY: ***NOTICE*** THE ATTACHED DOCUMENT IS NOT ACCESSIBLE. IT IS FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY. Proceedings held before District Judge John Preston Bailey: Evidentiary Hearing held on 9/20/2019. (Court Reporter Cindy Knecht.) (soa)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER granting #146 Motion. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 9/20/19. (lmm)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER granting #147 Motion. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 9/19/19. (lmm)
September 19, 2019 Filing 147 MOTION for Leave to Appear telephonically at September 20, 2019 Evidentiary Hearing by RONALD L. VIOLI. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Wilson, Kristen)
September 19, 2019 Filing 146 MOTION for Leave to Seal the September 20, 2019 Evidentiary Hearing and Transcript re 144 Paperless Order,, Set Motion, Evidentiary, R&R and Social Security Oral Argument Deadlines/Hearings, by RONALD L. VIOLI. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Wilson, Kristen)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING #104 #106 #108 MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 9/18/19. (lmm)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 144 PAPERLESS ORDER: An in-person Evidentiary Hearing regarding the deposition of Ronald Violi is now set for 9/20/2019, at 10:00 AM, in the Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, North, before District Judge John Preston Bailey. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 9/18/2019. (JP)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER ***SEALED*** Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 9/18/19. (counsel via email) (lmm)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 139 PAPERLESS ORDER: Upon consideration, this Court DENIES the Defendant's Motion for Protective Order 138 . Accordingly, the deposition shall proceed as ordered in this Court's Order of July 18, 2019. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 9/16/2019. (JP)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER: Granting 133 Motion to Seal; Def's Motion for Protective Order with accompanying exhibits to be filed under SEAL and remain permanently UNDER SEAL. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 9/16/19. (soa)
September 16, 2019 Filing 136 REPLY to Response to Motion re 133 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Protective Order Under Seal, filed by RONALD L. VIOLI. (Wilson, Kristen) Modified on 9/16/2019 to link with correct document and modify docket text (nmm).
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER GRANTING #132 MOTION TO WITHDRAW. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 9/16/2019. (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm)
September 16, 2019 Filing 134 RESPONSE in Opposition re 133 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Protective Order Under Seal, filed by United States of America. (Kinskey, Greg) Modified on 9/16/2019 to link with correct document and modify docket text (nmm).
September 13, 2019 Filing 132 MOTION to Withdraw 131 Motion for Leave to File Protective Order Under Seal and Accompanying Memorandum by RONALD L. VIOLI. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Wilson, Kristen) Modified on 9/13/2019 to link with Motion to be withdrawn (nmm).
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER GRANTING THE UNITED STATES #129 LEAVE TO FILE SURREPLY IN OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 9/4/19. (lmm)
August 29, 2019 Filing 129 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply Brief in Opposition to defendants' motions to dismiss by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Surreply Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kinskey, Greg)
August 26, 2019 Filing 128 RESPONSE in Support re #104 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and FAILURE TO PLEAD CLAIMS WITH SPECIFICITY filed by Wheeling Hospital, Inc.. (Chernenko, Marc)
August 26, 2019 Filing 127 RESPONSE in Opposition re #108 MOTION to Dismiss Government's Complaint in Intervention filed by RONALD L. VIOLI. (Wilson, Kristen)
August 26, 2019 Filing 126 RESPONSE in Opposition re #106 MOTION to Dismiss Government's Complaint in Intervention filed by R&V ASSOCIATES, LTD.. (Wilson, Kristen)
August 19, 2019 Filing 125 Memorandum in Opposition re #106 MOTION to Dismiss Government's Complaint in Intervention, #104 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and FAILURE TO PLEAD CLAIMS WITH SPECIFICITY, #108 MOTION to Dismiss Government's Complaint in Intervention filed by United States of America. (Kinskey, Greg)
August 15, 2019 Filing 124 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by RONALD L. VIOLI Defendants R&V Associates LTD'S and Ronald L. Violi's Initial Dislcosures. (Wilson, Kristen)
August 15, 2019 Filing 123 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Louis Longo Relator's Initial Disclosures. (Terek, Christina)
August 15, 2019 Filing 122 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wheeling Hospital, Inc. for Defendant Wheeling Hospital's Initial Disclosures. (Chernenko, Marc)
August 12, 2019 Filing 121 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by RONALD L. VIOLI for First Set of Request for Production. (Wilson, Kristen)
August 12, 2019 Filing 120 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by RONALD L. VIOLI First Interrogatories to Plaintiff. (Wilson, Kristen)
August 9, 2019 Filing 119 NOTICE by United States of America re #53 Notice of Appearance and its Designation of Lead Attorney and Attorney to be Noticed (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kinskey, Greg)
August 9, 2019 Filing 118 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America of its First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to defendant R & V Associates, Ltd.. (Kinskey, Greg)
August 6, 2019 Filing 117 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America of its First Discovery Requests to Wheeling Hospital, Inc.. (Kinskey, Greg)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 SCHEDULING ORDER. Joiner & Amendments due by 1/31/2020. Discovery due by 4/30/2020. Motions due by 7/15/2020. Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/5/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/2/2020 02:00 PM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, North before District Judge John Preston Bailey. Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 11/10/2020 09:00 AM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, North before District Judge John Preston Bailey. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 8/5/19. (lmm)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 STIPULATED CLAWBACK ORDER. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 8/5/19. (lmm)
August 1, 2019 Filing 114 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulated Clawback Order)(Kinskey, Greg)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER GRANTING THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Granting #110 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #110 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #106 MOTION to Dismiss Government's Complaint in Intervention, #104 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and FAILURE TO PLEAD CLAIMS WITH SPECIFICITY, and #108 Motion. United States' Responses due by 8/19/2019 as to #104 , #106 , & #108 . Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 7/29/19. (soa) Modified on 7/29/2019 to correct response date and regenerate NEF(soa).
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER: Granting #111 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Christina S Terek for Louis Longo. Attorney Sharon L. Potter terminated for Louis Longo. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 7/29/19. (soa)
July 26, 2019 Filing 111 MOTION to Substitute Attorney in Action and as Responsible Local Attorney by Louis Longo. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Potter, Sharon)
July 25, 2019 Filing 110 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #106 MOTION to Dismiss Government's Complaint in Intervention, #104 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and FAILURE TO PLEAD CLAIMS WITH SPECIFICITY, #108 MOTION to Dismiss Government's Complaint in Intervention Agreed Motion by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kinskey, Greg)
July 19, 2019 Filing 109 Memorandum in Support re #108 MOTION to Dismiss Government's Complaint in Intervention filed by RONALD L. VIOLI. (Wilson, Kristen)
July 19, 2019 Filing 108 MOTION to Dismiss Government's Complaint in Intervention by RONALD L. VIOLI. (Wilson, Kristen)
July 19, 2019 Filing 107 Memorandum in Support re #106 MOTION to Dismiss Government's Complaint in Intervention filed by R&V ASSOCIATES, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Wilson, Kristen)
July 19, 2019 Filing 106 MOTION to Dismiss Government's Complaint in Intervention by R&V ASSOCIATES, LTD.. (Wilson, Kristen)
July 19, 2019 Filing 105 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS THE GOVERNMENT'S COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION by Wheeling Hospital, Inc. re #104 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and FAILURE TO PLEAD CLAIMS WITH SPECIFICITY . (Chernenko, Marc)
July 19, 2019 Filing 104 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and FAILURE TO PLEAD CLAIMS WITH SPECIFICITY by Wheeling Hospital, Inc.. (Chernenko, Marc)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO TAKE DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT RONALD L. VIOLI: Deposition of Violi to commence week of 9/16/19. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 7/18/19. (soa)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 STIPULATION and Order to Extend time to take Deposition of Defendant Ronald L. Violi by RONALD L. VIOLI. (Wilson, Kristen)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER: Granting #99 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Andrew M. Stone withdrawn from the case and removed from the docket. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 7/16/19. (soa)
July 16, 2019 Filing 99 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Andrew M. Stone, Esq. by Louis Longo. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Potter, Sharon)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER APPROVING DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ATTORNEY'S APPLICATION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE: Granting #96 Motion for Leave to Appear PHV by Laurie A. Oberembt. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 7/16/19. (soa)
July 15, 2019 Filing 97 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America of its Initial Disclosures. (Kinskey, Greg)
July 15, 2019 Filing 96 MOTION for Leave to Appear - Department of Justice Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Laurie Oberembt by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kinskey, Greg)
July 15, 2019 Filing 95 TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER by United States of America for proceedings held on 6/25/2019 before Judge Bailey. (ck)
July 15, 2019 Filing 94 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/25/2019, before Judge Bailey. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cindy Knecht, Telephone number 304.234.3968. Parties have five business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will become available via PACER to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.. Redaction Request due 8/5/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/15/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2019. (ck)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER: Granting #89 Motion for PHV for Benjamin Ogletree. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 7/15/19. (soa)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER: Granting #91 Motion for Leave to Appear PHV for George Horn, Jr. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 7/15/19. (soa)
July 10, 2019 Filing 91 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (George E. Horn, Jr.) by Wheeling Hospital, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Other matters before WV tribunals, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order regarding admission)(Chernenko, Marc)
July 2, 2019 Filing 90 PHV Filing fee for Benjamin Ogletree: $ 200.00, receipt number WVNW002225 (lmm)
July 2, 2019 Filing 89 Other Document Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by R&V ASSOCIATES, LTD., RONALD L. VIOLI. (Wilson, Kristen) Modified on 7/2/2019 to correct event type (lmm).
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting #80 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Fazee. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 7/1/19. (lmm)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting #79 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Martin. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 7/1/19. (lmm)
June 28, 2019 Filing 86 PHV Filing fee for Attorney Martin and Frazee: $ 400.00, receipt number WVNW002221 (lmm)
June 26, 2019 Filing 85 PHV Filing fee for Kerry Verdi and Stephen Stallings : $ 400.00, receipt number WVNW002216 (lmm)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER OF MOTION HEARING. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 6/25/19. (lmm)
June 25, 2019 Filing 83 MINUTE ENTRY: ***NOTICE*** THE ATTACHED DOCUMENT IS NOT ACCESSIBLE. IT IS FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY. Proceedings held before District Judge John Preston Bailey: Motion Hearing held on 6/25/2019 re #37 filed by United States of America. (Court Reporter Cindy Knecht.) (lmm)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #75 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sinfelt. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 6/25/19. (lmm)
June 24, 2019 Filing 81 PHV Filing fee for Meena T. Sinfelt: $ 200.00, receipt number WVNW002213 (lmm)
June 24, 2019 Filing 80 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (David Frazee) by Wheeling Hospital, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Other matters before WV tribunals, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order regarding admission)(Chernenko, Marc)
June 24, 2019 Filing 79 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (William Martin) by Wheeling Hospital, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit other matters before WV tribunals, #2 Text of Proposed Order proposed order regarding admission)(Chernenko, Marc)
June 24, 2019 Filing 78 Corporate Disclosure Statement by R&V ASSOCIATES, LTD.. (Wilson, Kristen)
June 24, 2019 Filing 77 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wheeling Hospital, Inc.. (Chernenko, Marc)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 PAPERLESS ORDER: Upon consideration, the Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 Intervenor Complaint #63 is GRANTED. Accordingly, the time within which the defendants shall answer or otherwise respond is EXTENDED to July 24, 2019. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 6/24/2019. (JP)
June 24, 2019 Filing 75 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Wheeling Hospital, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Other matters before WV tribunals, #2 Text of Proposed Order proposed order regarding admission)(Chernenko, Marc)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting #68 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Verdi. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 6/24/19. (lmm)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #67 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stallings. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 6/24/19. (lmm)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #65 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Easton. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 6/24/19. (lmm)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting #66 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Dickstein. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 6/24/19. (lmm)
June 21, 2019 Filing 70 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee for Jeffrey Dickstein: $ 200.00, receipt number WVNW002212 (nmm)
June 21, 2019 Filing 69 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee for Amy Easton: $ 200.00, receipt number WVNW002211 (nmm)
June 21, 2019 Filing 68 Other Document Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by R&V ASSOCIATES, LTD., RONALD L. VIOLI. (Wilson, Kristen) Modified on 6/21/2019 to correct event type (lmm).
June 21, 2019 Filing 67 Other Document Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by R&V ASSOCIATES, LTD., RONALD L. VIOLI. (Wilson, Kristen) Modified on 6/21/2019 to correct event type (lmm).
June 20, 2019 Filing 66 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice - Jeffrey Dickstein Other Document filed by Louis Longo. (Potter, Sharon) Modified on 6/20/2019 to correct event type (lmm).
June 20, 2019 Filing 65 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice - Amy Easton Other Document filed by Louis Longo. (Potter, Sharon) Modified on 6/20/2019 to correct event type. (lmm).
June 20, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon L. Potter on behalf of Louis Longo (Potter, Sharon)
June 20, 2019 Filing 63 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 Intervenor Complaint by R&V ASSOCIATES, LTD.. (Wilson, Kristen)
June 20, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Andrews Wilson on behalf of RONALD L. VIOLI (Wilson, Kristen)
June 20, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Andrews Wilson on behalf of R&V ASSOCIATES, LTD. (Wilson, Kristen)
June 20, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc B. Chernenko on behalf of Wheeling Hospital, Inc. (Chernenko, Marc)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 PAPERLESS ORDER: A Motion Hearing is hereby set for 6/25/2019, at 2:00 PM, in the Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, North, before District Judge John Preston Bailey, to address the United States' Motion for Leave to Preserve Testimony of Defendant Ronald L. Violi by Conducting Early Deposition #37 . It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 6/19/2019. (JP)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER APPROVING DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ATTORNEY'S APPLICATION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE granting #55 Motion. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 6/19/19. (lmm)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER APPROVING DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ATTORNEY'S APPLICATION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE granting #54 Motion. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 6/19/19. (lmm)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 7/18/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/1/2019. Discovery due by 8/15/2019. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 6/18/19. (lmm)
June 18, 2019 Filing 55 MOTION for Leave to Appear - Department of Justice Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Colin Callahan by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kinskey, Greg) Modified docket text on 6/18/2019 to correctly identify PHV Atty.; NEF Regenerated (nmm).
June 18, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION for Leave to Appear - Department of Justice Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rohith Srinivas by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kinskey, Greg) Modified docket text on 6/18/2019 to correctly identify PHV Attorney; NEF Regenerated (nmm).
June 18, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Greg T. Kinskey on behalf of United States of America (Kinskey, Greg)
June 11, 2019 Filing 52 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION for Attorneys Easton, Stone, Dickstein, Callahan, Srinivas, Wiegand, Horn, Sinfelt, Verdi and Stallings. (lmm)
June 11, 2019 Filing 51 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Western; Case Number 2:17-cv-01654. (lmm)
June 11, 2019 Case electronically transferred to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia. (jv) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/11/2019.]
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #26 Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia. Court defers ruling on the government's #37 Motion for Leave to Preserve the Testimony of Roland L. Violi by Conducting an Early Deposition, in order to permit the transferee Court to consider this motion. Pending a ruling by the Northern District of West Virginia Court, IT IS ORDERED that there shall be no deposition of Mr. Violi. Counsel for Mr. Violi shall comply with the directions for submissions to be made to the West Virginia Court as stated in the Order. The Clerk of Court is ORDERED to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the District of West Virginia, forthwith. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 6/10/2019. (rtw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/11/2019.]
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 OPINION indicating that Court will grant Defendants' #26 Motion to Transfer Venue in this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia. Defendants have met their burden of proving that venue is proper in West Virginia, and that convenience and justice would be served by transferring the action. The Court defers ruling on government's #37 Motion for Leave to Preserve the Testimony of Roland L. Violi by Conducting an Early Deposition, in order to allow the receiving Court to decide that issue. This action shall be transferred to the Northern District of West Virginia forthwith. An appropriate Order will be entered. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 6/10/2019. (rtw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/11/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 48 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marilyn J. Horan: Motion Hearing held on 6/4/2019. Argument heard re #37 MOTION for Leave to preserve testimony of Defendant Ronald L. Violi by conducting Early Deposition and #26 MOTION to Transfer Venue. Motions taken under advisement. Parties directed to provide status update to court by Friday, June 7, 2019. (Court Reporter: Noreen Re) (rtw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/11/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 47 BRIEF in RESPONSE to Motion re #37 MOTION Leave to preserve testimony of Defendant Ronald L. Violi by conducting Early Deposition filed by WHEELING HOSPITAL, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Sinfelt, Meena) Modified text on 5/30/2019. (jv)[Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/11/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 46 BRIEF in RESPONSE to Motion re #37 MOTION Leave to preserve testimony of Defendant Ronald L. Violi by conducting Early Deposition filed by R&V ASSOCIATES, LTD., RONALD L. VIOLI. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stallings, Stephen) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/11/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 45 REPLY BRIEF to Response to Motion re #43 Brief in Opposition to Motion to Change Venue #26 filed by R&V ASSOCIATES, LTD., RONALD L. VIOLI, WHEELING HOSPITAL, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Sinfelt, Meena) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/11/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 TEXT ORDER: The Motion Hearing currently set for 6/4/2019 at 11:00 AM has been RESCHEDULED for 6/4/2019 02:30 PM in Courtroom 8A before Judge Marilyn J. Horan. Counsel shall be prepared to discuss Motions on ECF No.'s #26 and #37 . Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 5/20/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jgb) Modified text on 5/20/2019. (jgb) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/11/2019.]
May 17, 2019 Filing 43 BRIEF in Opposition re #26 Motion to Change Venue filed by LOUIS LONGO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Louis Longo, #2 Exhibit Motion to Dismiss (Wheeling Lawsuit)) (Srinivas, Rohith) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/11/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER ON #41 STIPULATION TO PARTIALLY STAY PROCEEDINGS. All proceedings in this case are stayed except as to the United States' pending #37 Motion to preserve the testimony of Defendant Ronald L. Violi, as further stated in Stipulation. Stay will be in effect until 10 days after the Court resolves defendants' #26 Motion to Transfer Venue. Defendants may file a reply to Plaintiff response to Motion to Transfer Venue within seven days after the response is filed. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 5/16/2019. (rtw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/11/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 41 STIPULATION (Corrected to reflect 10 days in paragraph 1 and 7 days in paragraph 2) by R&V ASSOCIATES, LTD., RONALD L. VIOLI, WHEELING HOSPITAL, INC.. (Stallings, Stephen) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/11/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 40 ERROR ON DOCUMENT; THIS DOCUMENT HAS BEEN REMOVED FROM PUBLIC VIEW; STIPULATION to Partially Stay Proceedings by R&V ASSOCIATES, LTD., RONALD L. VIOLI, WHEELING HOSPITAL, INC. (Stallings, Stephen) Modified text on 5/17/2019. (cel) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/11/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 TEXT ORDER Setting Hearing on #37 Motion for Leave to preserve testimony of Defendant Ronald L. Violi by conducting Early Deposition : Motion Hearing set for 6/4/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8A before Judge Marilyn J. Horan. Brief in Opposition to Motion is due by 5/28/2019. By 5/30/2019, Defendant Ronald Violi shall provide in camera, any private medical material, by directly submitting said material to Chambers via mail or by email to horan_chambers@pawd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 5/16/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (rtw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/11/2019.]
May 15, 2019 Filing 38 BRIEF in Support re #37 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief to Preserve Testimony of Defendant Ronald L. Violi by conducting Early Deposition filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Callahan, Colin) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/11/2019.]
May 15, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION Leave to preserve testimony of Defendant Ronald L. Violi by conducting Early Deposition by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Callahan, Colin) Modified text on 6/11/2019 to terminate motion for USDC for Western District of Pa ruling. (jv) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/11/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING #33 Motion for Meena T. Sinfelt to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 5/14/2019. (jgb) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/11/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 35 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marilyn J. Horan: Telephone Conference held on 5/13/2019, to discuss early discovery for expedited video deposition of defendant. Parties to discuss resolution of this issue. If unsuccessful, government to file motion for deposition; response will be due within 10 days; oral argument will be promptly scheduled. Discussion held re Defendants' motion to transfer venue and motion to stay. Court advises parties to file stipulation re resolution of motion to stay with proposed order. Briefing on motion to transfer will occur in accordance with Court's procedures. (Court Reporter: Noreen Re) (rtw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/11/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STANDING ORDER ON MOTIONS PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 5/13/19. (rtw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/11/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for attorney Meena T Sinfelt to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5134534) by WHEELING HOSPITAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order) (Sinfelt, Meena) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/11/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING #24 Motion for Kerry Brainard Verdi to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 5/11/2019. (jgb) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/11/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by George E. Horn, Jr on behalf of WHEELING HOSPITAL, INC. (Horn, George) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/11/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 30 Proposed Order re #24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by R&V ASSOCIATES, LTD., RONALD L. VIOLI. (Verdi, Kerry) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/11/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 29 BRIEF in Support re #28 Motion to Stay filed by R&V ASSOCIATES, LTD., RONALD L. VIOLI, WHEELING HOSPITAL, INC. (Stallings, Stephen) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/11/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Stay by R&V ASSOCIATES, LTD., RONALD L. VIOLI, WHEELING HOSPITAL, INC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stallings, Stephen) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/11/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 27 BRIEF in Support of #26 MOTION to Change Venue filed by R&V ASSOCIATES, LTD., RONALD L. VIOLI, WHEELING HOSPITAL, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Ogletree Dec, #2 Exhibit 2 - Murdy Dec, #3 Exhibit 3 - Maevsky Dec, #4 Exhibit 4 - Schmitt Dec, #5 Exhibit 5 - Shinn Dec, #6 Exhibit 6 - Swamy Dec, #7 Exhibit 7 - McKeets Dec, #8 Exhibit 8 - Ludwick Dec, #9 Exhibit 9 - Shoulders Dec) (Stallings, Stephen) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/11/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Change Venue by R&V ASSOCIATES, LTD., RONALD L. VIOLI, WHEELING HOSPITAL, INC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stallings, Stephen) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/11/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ORDER: A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 5/13/2019 at 10:00 AM. All participants shall contact the Chambers on a single telephone line, and Plaintiffs' counsel shall coordinate the call. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 5/10/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jgb) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/11/2019.]
May 10, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ERROR: Proposed Order was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file a proposed order by using the Proposed Order event and linking it to the document in question. This message is for informational purposes only. (jv) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/11/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for attorney Kerry Brainard Verdi to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5131794) by R&V ASSOCIATES, LTD., RONALD L. VIOLI. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Verdi, Kerry) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/11/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from R&V ASSOCIATES, LTD. on 5/24/2019; RONALD L. VIOLI on 5/24/2019; WHEELING HOSPITAL, INC. on 5/24/2019 (jv) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/11/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed on 3/25/2019 Answer due from RONALD L. VIOLI on 5/24/2019 by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Callahan, Colin) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/11/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed on 3/25/2019 Answer due from R & V Associates, Ltd. on 5/24/2019 by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Callahan, Colin) Modified text on 4/5/2019. (jv) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/11/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed on 3/25/2019 Answer due from WHEELING HOSPITAL, INC. on 5/24/2019 by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Callahan, Colin) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/11/2019.]
April 2, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen S. Stallings on behalf of R&V ASSOCIATES, LTD., RONALD L. VIOLI. (Stallings, Stephen) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/11/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 19 INTERVENOR COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Srinivas, Rohith) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/11/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #16 Motion for Jeffrey Dickstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice..Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 3/18/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jgb) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/11/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER GRANTING #15 Motion for Amy Easton to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 3/18/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jgb) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/11/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for attorney Jeffrey W. Dickstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5065507) by LOUIS LONGO. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jeffrey W. Dickstein, #2 Proposed Order) (Dickstein, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/11/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for attorney Amy L. Easton to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5065414) by LOUIS LONGO. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Amy L. Easton, #2 Proposed Order) (Easton, Amy ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/11/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Rohith V. Srinivas on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Srinivas, Rohith) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/11/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion to Reset Deadline. It is hereby ORDERED the United States shall have until and including 3/25/2019 to file and serve its complaint in intervention on defendants. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 2/7/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jgb) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/11/2019.]
February 6, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION Reset Deadline re #11 Order,, by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Callahan, Colin) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/11/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that having considered the #10 Notice of Election to Intervene in Part and to Decline to Intervene in Part, it is ORDERED that the Relators' #1 Complaint; the #10 Notice of Election and proposed Order; and this Order, shall be unsealed. All other papers or Orders previously filed in this matter shall remain under seal; all matters filed after this Order shall not be filed under seal, subject to the Court's leave; and it is ORDERED that within 60 days of this Order, the United States shall file and serve its complaint in intervention on defendants. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 12/20/2018. (rtw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/11/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ELECTION TO INTERVENE IN PART AND TO DECLINE TO INTERVENE IN PART by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (jv) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/11/2019.]
December 22, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against R&V ASSOCIATES, LTD., RONALD L. VIOLI, WHEELING HOSPITAL, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 24668047664), filed by LOUIS LONGO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt) (ept) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/11/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LONGO et al v. WHEELING HOSPITAL, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R&V ASSOCIATES, LTD.
Represented By: Kerry Brainard Verdi
Represented By: Stephen S Stallings
Represented By: Benjamin Robert Ogletree
Represented By: Kristen Andrews Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wheeling Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Meena T. Sinfelt
Represented By: George E. Horn, Jr.
Represented By: William R. Martin
Represented By: Marc B. Chernenko
Represented By: David A. Frazee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD L. VIOLI
Represented By: Kerry Brainard Verdi
Represented By: Stephen S Stallings
Represented By: Benjamin Robert Ogletree
Represented By: Kristen Andrews Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Longo
Represented By: Andrew M. Stone
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Dickstein
Represented By: Amy L. Easton
Represented By: Sharon L. Potter
Represented By: Christina S Terek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Rohith V. Srinivas
Represented By: Colin J. Callahan
Represented By: Christy C. Wiegand
Represented By: Laurie A. Oberembt
Represented By: Greg T. Kinskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Adam Tune
Represented By: Danielle L Dietrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?