Kisner v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Cheryl Kisner
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv00194
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company for Its 1st Set of Combined Discovery Requests to Plaintiff. (Odell, Ashley)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings/Joinder of Parties due by 9/16/2019. Discovery due by 5/1/2020. Motions due by 6/1/2020. Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/20/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/31/2020 02:00 PM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, North before District Judge John Preston Bailey. Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 9/15/2020 09:00 AM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, North before District Judge John Preston Bailey. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 7/30/19. (soa)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Odell, Ashley)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins. Co. for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.. (Odell, Ashley)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Odell, Ashley)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 7/15/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/29/2019. Discovery due by 8/14/2019. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 6/17/19. (lmm)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Marshall County, West Virginia, (case number 19-C-109), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-2839941. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court docket sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Court filings, #3 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (copy to counsel via CM/ECF) (nmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kisner v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Kisner
Represented By: Erica A. Conti
Represented By: James G. Bordas, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Ashley Hardesty Odell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?