Cortez v. Canaan USP Warden et al
Plaintiff: Armando Cardon Cortez
Defendant: Canaan USP Warden, Hazelton USP Warden and Gilmer FCI Warden
Case Number: 5:2019cv00197
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: James P Mazzone
Referring Judge: Frederick P Stamp
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN RECEIPT as to #11 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER AFFIRMING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND OVERRULING PLAINTIFFS OBJECTION and #12 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 7/29/2019. (nmm)
July 25, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court on 7/25/2019. (copy to Pro Se Plaintiff via cm,rrr) (nmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/25/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (nmm).
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER AFFIRMING AND ADOPTING #7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND OVERRULING #10 PLAINTIFFS OBJECTION: plaintiff's #1 complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and the #2 motion to proceed in forma pauperis and #5 motion to appoint counsel are DENIED AS MOOT. It is further ORDERED that this case DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and STRICKEN from the active docket of this Court. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgment on this matter. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 7/25/2019. (copy to Pro Se Plaintiff via cm,rrr) (nmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/25/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (nmm).
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 OBJECTION to #7 Report and Recommendations. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmm)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN RECEIPT as to #7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 6/24/2019. (nmm)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 6/19/2019. (nmm)
June 20, 2019 Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone no longer assigned to case pursuant to #7 Report and Recommendation. (nmm)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: it is RECOMMENDED that the #1 Complaint be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; #2 Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and #5 motion for appointment of a lawyer be TERMINATED as MOOT. Written objections shall be filed within fourteen (14) days after being served with a copy of this Report and Recommendation. Failure to file written objections as set forth above shall constitute a waiver of de novo review by the District Court and a waiver of appellate review by the Circuit Court of Appeals. The Clerk is directed to terminate the Magistrate Judge's association with this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 6/20/2019. (copy to Pro Se Plaintiff via CM,rrr) (nmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/20/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (nmm).
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT by Armando Cardon Cortez. (Pro Se Plaintiff via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/21/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF LAWYER by Armando Cardon Cortez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmm)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Armando Cardon Cortez. (Attachments: #1 Ledger Sheets, #2 Ledger Sheets, #3 Envelope)(lmm)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Armando Cardon Cortez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmm)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Armando Cardon Cortez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmm)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Armando Cardon Cortez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Inmate Request, #2 Exhibit B - Medical Record, #3 Exhibit C - 4/4/16 letter to Chuck Maiorana Warden, #4 Exhibit D - Medical Record, #5 Exhibit E - Medical Record, #6 Exhibit F - Medical Record, #7 Exhibit G - Medical Record, #8 Inmate Request to Staff, #9 Summons, #10 Envelope)(lmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cortez v. Canaan USP Warden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canaan USP Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hazelton USP Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilmer FCI Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armando Cardon Cortez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?