Mingo Junction Steel Works, LLC v. Starvaggi Industries, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mingo Junction Steel Works, LLC
Defendant: Metal Services, LLC and Starvaggi Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00200
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 55 Memorandum in Support re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Mingo Junction Steel Works, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Attachment Out of Jurisdiction Cases)(Cardi, Michael)
August 14, 2019 Filing 54 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Following August 1, 2019, Hearing filed by Starvaggi Industries, Inc.. (Schaeffer, Joseph)
August 14, 2019 Filing 53 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Metal Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Baldwin, Michelle)
August 12, 2019 Filing 52 TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER by Mingo Junction Steel Works, LLC for proceedings held on 8/1/2019 before Judge Bailey. (ck)
August 7, 2019 Filing 51 TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER by Starvaggi Industries, Inc. for proceedings held on 8/1/2019 before Judge Bailey. (ck)
August 7, 2019 Filing 50 TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER by Metal Services, LLC for proceedings held on 8/1/2019 before Judge Bailey. (ck)
August 7, 2019 Filing 49 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/1/2019, before Judge Bailey. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cindy Knecht, Telephone number 304.234.3968. Parties have five business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will become available via PACER to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.. Redaction Request due 8/28/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/9/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/5/2019. (ck)
August 6, 2019 Filing 48 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Metal Services, LLC. (Baldwin, Michelle)
August 1, 2019 Filing 47 Clerk's Witness and Exhibit List. (bjt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/6/2019: #1 Exhibit Letter dated 10/1/47, #2 Exhibit Plat of Survey dated 6/17/2019, #3 Exhibit Letter dated 11/29/68 w/change order, #4 Exhibit Worksite map dated 6/8/16, #5 Exhibit Picture of Worksite taken week of 7/29/19, #6 Exhibit Amendment to Lease Agreement/Lease dated 7/08, #7 Exhibit Agreement of Purchase and Sale, #8 Exhibit Map of Worksite, #9 Exhibit Photo/Map, #10 Exhibit Certificate of Appreciation dated 10/5/18, #11 Exhibit Picture of Worksite showing PA Ave along worksite, #12 Exhibit Quitclaim Deed dated 10/25/16, #13 Exhibit Letter dated 3/12/10 by Mr. Schwab) (bjt).
August 1, 2019 Filing 46 MINUTE ENTRY: ***NOTICE*** THE ATTACHED DOCUMENT IS NOT ACCESSIBLE. IT IS FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY. Proceedings held before District Judge John Preston Bailey: Motion Hearing held on 8/1/2019 re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Mingo Junction Steel Works, LLC. (Court Reporter Cindy Knecht.) (bjt) (Main Document 46 replaced on 8/2/2019) (bjt). Modified on 8/2/2019, to correct clerical error. (bjt).
July 29, 2019 Filing 45 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Metal Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 McGinty Deposition, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 Franjoine Deposition)(Baldwin, Michelle)
July 29, 2019 Filing 44 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Starvaggi Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schaeffer, Joseph)
July 26, 2019 Filing 43 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mingo Junction Steel Works, LLC. (Cardi, Michael)
July 25, 2019 Filing 42 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Starvaggi Industries, Inc.. (Schaeffer, Joseph)
July 25, 2019 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Starvaggi Industries, Inc. for Amended and Supplemental Responses to Mingo Junction Steel Works, LLC's First Combined Discovery Requests. (Schaeffer, Joseph)
July 25, 2019 Filing 40 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Mingo Junction Steel Works, LLC by Starvaggi Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Schaeffer, Joseph)
July 24, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph V. Schaeffer on behalf of Starvaggi Industries, Inc. (Schaeffer, Joseph)
July 23, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Hardesty Odell on behalf of Mingo Junction Steel Works, LLC (Odell, Ashley)
July 19, 2019 Filing 37 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiff's Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition of Defendant Metal Services LLC d/b/a Phoenix Services LLC to #29 Certificate of Service by Metal Services, LLC. (Baldwin, Michelle)
July 18, 2019 Filing 36 Metal Services LLC d/b/a Phoenix Services LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Metal Services, LLC.(Baldwin, Michelle)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Motion Hearing that was previously scheduled for August 1, 2019, REMAINS SET with a TIME CHANGE ONLY. The Motion Hearing will begin at 2:00 PM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, North, before District Judge John Preston Bailey. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 7/17/2019. (bjt)
July 17, 2019 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mingo Junction Steel Works, LLC for Amended Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Defendant Metal Services, LLC d/b/a Phoenix Services LLC. (Cardi, Michael)
July 17, 2019 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mingo Junction Steel Works, LLC for Amended Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Starvaggi Industries, Inc. (Cardi, Michael)
July 16, 2019 Filing 32 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Starvaggi Industries, Inc..(Walls, James)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: Granting #24 Motion for Leave to Appear PHV for Kenneth Mellor. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 7/15/19. (soa)
July 11, 2019 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mingo Junction Steel Works, LLC for Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Starvaggi Industries, Inc.. (Cardi, Michael)
July 11, 2019 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mingo Junction Steel Works, LLC for Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Defendant, Metal Services, LLC d/b/a Phoenix Services LLC. (Cardi, Michael)
July 11, 2019 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Starvaggi Industries, Inc. for Amended Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Mingo Junction Steel Works, LLC (Walls, James)
July 11, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Walls on behalf of Starvaggi Industries, Inc. (Walls, James)
July 9, 2019 Filing 26 PHV fee for Kenneth B. Mellor: $ 200.00, receipt number WVNW002229. (soa)
July 9, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Metal Services, LLC for Answers and Responses to Plaintiff's First Combined Discovery Requests. (Baldwin, Michelle)
July 9, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kenneth B. Mellor by Mingo Junction Steel Works, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cardi, Michael)
July 8, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Starvaggi Industries, Inc. for Starvaggi Industries' Response to Mingo Junction Steel Works' Second Set of Requests for Admission (Walls, James)
July 8, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Starvaggi Industries, Inc. for Starvaggi Industries' Responses to Mingo Junction Steel Works' First Combined Discovery Requests (Walls, James)
July 8, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mingo Junction Steel Works, LLC for Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant Metal Services, LLC d/b/a Phoenix Services LLC's First Set of Combined Discovery Requests. (Cardi, Michael)
July 8, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mingo Junction Steel Works, LLC for Plaintiff's Responses to Starvaggi Industries, Inc.'s Second Request for Production of Documents. (Cardi, Michael)
July 8, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle D. Baldwin on behalf of Metal Services, LLC (Baldwin, Michelle)
July 8, 2019 Filing 18 OBJECTIONS to Starvaggi Industries, Inc.'s Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition to #13 Certificate of Service by Mingo Junction Steel Works, LLC. (Cardi, Michael)
July 5, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Metal Services, LLC for Objections to Plaintiff's First Combined Discovery to Metal Services, LLC. (Baldwin, Michelle)
July 5, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Metal Services, LLC served on 6/26/2019. (soa)
July 5, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Starvaggi Industries, Inc. served on 6/26/2019. (soa)
July 5, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mingo Junction Steel Works, LLC for Plaintiff's Responses to Starvaggi Industries, Inc.'s First Request for Production of Documents. (Cardi, Michael)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Starvaggi Industries, Inc. for Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Mingo Junction Steel Works, LLC (Walls, James)
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Metal Services, LLC First Set of Combined Discovery Requests to Plaintiff, Mingo Junction Steel Works,LLC. (Baldwin, Michelle)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Starvaggi Industries, Inc. for Starvaggi Industries' Second Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff (Walls, James)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mingo Junction Steel Works, LLC for Second Set of Requests for Admission to Defendant Starvaggi Industries, Inc. (Cardi, Michael)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mingo Junction Steel Works, LLC for First Combined Discovery Requests to Defendant Metal Services, LLC, d/b/a Phoenix Services LLC. (Cardi, Michael)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mingo Junction Steel Works, LLC for Mingo Junction Steel Works, LLC's First Combined Discovery Requests to Defendant Starvaggi Industries, Inc. (Cardi, Michael)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mingo Junction Steel Works, LLC for Plaintiff's Objections to Starvaggi Industries, Inc.'s First Request for Production of Documents. (Cardi, Michael)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Starvaggi Industries, Inc. for Starvaggi Industries' First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff (Walls, James)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Expedited Discovery. Motion Hearing set for 8/1/2019 10:00 AM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, North before District Judge John Preston Bailey re #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 6/25/19. (lmm)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Mingo Junction Steel Works, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1-Memo, #3 Exhibit 2-Memo, #4 Exhibit 3-Memo, #5 Exhibit 4-Memo)(Cardi, Michael)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Discovery Expedited by Mingo Junction Steel Works, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cardi, Michael)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Metal Services, LLC, Starvaggi Industries, Inc., filed by Mingo Junction Steel Works, LLC. Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-2843269. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Survey, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(lmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mingo Junction Steel Works, LLC v. Starvaggi Industries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metal Services, LLC
Represented By: Michelle D. Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starvaggi Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph V. Schaeffer
Represented By: James A. Walls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mingo Junction Steel Works, LLC
Represented By: Michael Clarke Cardi
Represented By: Kenneth B. Mellor
Represented By: Ashley Hardesty Odell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?