Worlwide Machinery, LTD v. Columbia Gas Transmission Corp.
Plaintiff: Worlwide Machinery, LTD
Defendant: Columbia Gas Trans. Corp.
Debtor: Welded Construction, L.P.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00208
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 JUDGMENT ORDER: Judgment entered in favor of Defendant; Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED; Complaint DISMISSED WITH PEJUDICE, Plaintif to recover nothing; and this Civil Action is DISMISSED and STRICKEN from the active docket of this Court. Signed by District Court Clerk, Cheryl Dean Riley on 8/5/19. (soa)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT: Granting #4 Motion to Dismiss; Clerk directed to enter judgment in favor of defendant and strike action from active docket of this Court. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 8/5/19. (soa)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Columbia Gas Trans. Corp.. (Meadows, John)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 Memorandum in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Worlwide Machinery, LTD. (Zamosky, Arthur)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORD from Circuit Court of Wetzel Co., WV. (soa)
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Columbia Gas Trans. Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum of Law)(Meadows, John)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 8/2/2019; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/16/2019; Initial Discovery Disclosures due by 8/30/2019. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 7/2/2019. (copy to counsel via CM/ECF) (nmm)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER WITHDRAWING REFERENCE. It is ORDERED that the Amended Orderof Reference dated April 2, 2013, be and is hereby WITHDRAWN solely with regards to the above-captioned adversary proceeding, and all further proceedings in the case will be conducted before the undersigned judge of the United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia.It is so ORDERED. The Bankruptcy Clerk for the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Northern District of West Virginia is directed to transmit copies of the Order to all parties of interest. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 7/1/2019. (kac)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Wetzel County Circuit Court, (case number 19-C-45 Hummel) to WVND Bankruptcy Court 5:19-ap-29, filed by Columbia Gas Trans. Corp.(kac)(document retrieved from PACER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Worlwide Machinery, LTD v. Columbia Gas Transmission Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Worlwide Machinery, LTD
Represented By: Arthur W. Zamosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Welded Construction, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Gas Trans. Corp.
Represented By: John J. Meadows
Represented By: Devon Joseph Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?