Miller v. Ashton et al
Plaintiff: Joshua D. Miller
Defendant: Richard Lee Ashton, James Donald Miller, Jr. and Todd Neuman
Case Number: 5:2019cv00212
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Frederick P Stamp
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Remand filed by Joshua D. Miller. (Harris, Paul)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER. Joinder & Amendments due by 1/13/2020. Discovery due by 3/16/2020. Motions due by 3/30/2020. Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/3/2020. Pretrial Conference/Final Settlement Conference set for 6/8/2020 10:00 AM in Judge Stamp Chambers before Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp Jr. Jury Selection /Jury Trial set for 6/23/2020 08:30 AM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, South before Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp Jr. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 8/19/19. (lmm)
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Harris, Paul)
August 16, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand filed by Richard Lee Ashton, Todd Neuman. (Russell, J.)
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Richard Lee Ashton, Todd Neuman. (Russell, J.)
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of by Joshua D. Miller re #8 MOTION to Remand . (Harris, Paul)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand by Joshua D. Miller. (Harris, Paul)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 Memorandum in Opposition re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Joshua D. Miller. (Harris, Paul)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by James Donald Miller, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sbrolla, Philip)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 Memorandum in Support re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Richard Lee Ashton, Todd Neuman. (Russell, J.)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Richard Lee Ashton, Todd Neuman. (Russell, J.)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip John Sbrolla on behalf of James Donald Miller, Jr. (Sbrolla, Philip)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 8/12/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/19/2019. Discovery due by 9/9/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 7/9/19. (lmm)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Ohio County Circuit Court, (case number 19-C-148), filed by Todd Neuman, Richard Lee Ashton. Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-2853151. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court documents, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court documents, #3 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of Rick L. Ashton, #4 Exhibit 4 - Docket Report in Belmont County, #5 Exhibit 5 - Verified Complaint, #6 Exhibit 6 - Petition, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (lmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Ashton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Lee Ashton
Represented By: John F. McCuskey
Represented By: J. Robert Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Donald Miller, Jr.
Represented By: Philip John Sbrolla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Neuman
Represented By: John F. McCuskey
Represented By: J. Robert Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua D. Miller
Represented By: Paul J. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?