Bank of America, N.A. v. Wilson et al
Petitioner: Bank of America, N.A.
Respondent: Mona L. Wilson and United States of America/Farmers Home Administration, United States Department of Agriculture
Case Number: 5:2019cv00215
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER from Clerk, U. S. District Court to Clerk, Circuit Court of Brooke Co., WV regarding #7 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (soa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/1/2019: #1 Receipt Letter) (soa).
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING AGREED MOTION TO REMAND CASE TO STATE COURT: Granting #5 Motion to Remand to State Court; case remanded to Circuit Court of Brooke Co., WV; counsel for USA to serve copies of this order upon the Circuit Court and all counsel of record. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 7/16/19. (soa)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA'S MOTION TO ESTABLISH TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: Granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Notice of Removal, filed by United States of America/Farmers Home Administration, United States Department of Agriculture; Govt Answer due within 60 days of removal of this case from Brooke Co. Circuit Court. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 7/15/19. (soa)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION Agreed Motion to Remand Case to State Court by United States of America/Farmers Home Administration, United States Department of Agriculture. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tighe, Tara)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER -- FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 8/12/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/26/2019. Initial Discovery Disclosures due by 9/12/2019. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 7/12/19. (soa)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION to D. Van Slyke re #1 Notice of Removal. (soa)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by United States of America/Farmers Home Administration, United States Department of Agriculture. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(soa)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Brooke Co., WV, (case number 19-C-1), filed by United States of America/Farmers Home Administration, United States Department of Agriculture. (Attachments: #1 State Court papers, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(soa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. Wilson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mona L. Wilson
Represented By: Marc B. Chernenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America/Farmers Home Administration, United States Department of Agriculture
Represented By: Tara Noel Tighe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: David Van Slyke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?