Subaru of America, Inc. v. A & B Sales, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Subaru of America, Inc.
Defendant: A & B Auto Sales, Inc. and A & B Sales, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00221
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF COURT: Granting #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Unopposed) filed by A & B Sales, Inc., A & B Auto Sales, Inc. Defs. have until 9/20/19 to file responses to Complaint. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 8/21/19. (soa)
August 21, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Unopposed) by A & B Auto Sales, Inc., A & B Sales, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McGee, Kyle)
August 21, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle T. McGee on behalf of A & B Auto Sales, Inc., A & B Sales, Inc. (McGee, Kyle)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear PHV for Mark Sommers. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 8/14/19. (soa)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear PHV for Samuel Eichner. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 8/14/19. (soa)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to A & B Sales, Inc. served on 7/31/2019. (soa)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to A & B Auto Sales, Inc. served on 7/31/2019. (soa)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 PHV Fees for Mark Sommers and Samuel Eichner: $ 400.00, receipt number WVNC002667. (soa)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Mark Sommers) by Subaru of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, William)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Samuel V. Eichner) by Subaru of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, William)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT to USPTO on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #1 Complaint. (Copy mailed to Director, U.S. Patent and Trademark Office) (soa)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Subaru of America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Subaru Corporation for Subaru of America, Inc... (O'Brien, William)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID against A & B Auto Sales, Inc., A & B Sales, Inc., filed by Subaru of America, Inc. Filing Fee $400. Receipt #0424-2862281. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(soa) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/22/2019) (mh). Modified on 7/22/2019 to add document with hyperlinks. NEF regen (mh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Subaru of America, Inc. v. A & B Sales, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A & B Auto Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle T. McGee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A & B Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle T. McGee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Subaru of America, Inc.
Represented By: William J O'Brien
Represented By: Gordon H. Copland
Represented By: Mark Sommers
Represented By: Samuel V. Eichner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?