Johnson v. Warden Hudgins
Petitioner: Harvey R. Johnson
Respondent: Warden Hudgins
Case Number: 5:2019cv00226
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: James P Mazzone
Referring Judge: Frederick P Stamp
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number WVNM001532 (lmm)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 Notice (Other), #2 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 7/29/19. (soa)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Attachments: #1 2241 Forms) (Pro Se Petitioner via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/25/2019: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. (Pro Se Petitioner via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/25/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Warden Hudgins. (Attachments: #1 Section A, #2 Envelope)(lmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Warden Hudgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Hudgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Harvey R. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?