Polhill v. Department of Justice Federal Bureau of Prisons et al
Plaintiff: John Polhill, IV
Defendant: Michael Smearman, J. Palmer and Department of Justice Federal Bureau of Prisons
Case Number: 5:2019cv00233
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: James P Mazzone
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from John Polhill, IV to Clerk requesting Court Approved Form that should have been attached to #2 NOTICE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Bivens form/packet placed in mail this day) (nmm)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN RECEIPT as to #2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO DISMISS. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/5/2019. (nmm)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO DISMISS. (copy to Pro Se Plaintiff via cm,rrr) (nmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/2/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (nmm).
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF against All Defendants, filed by John Polhill, IV. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Polhill v. Department of Justice Federal Bureau of Prisons et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Smearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Polhill, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?