Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition et al v. Eagle Natrium, LLC
Plaintiff: The Sierra Club and Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition
Defendant: Eagle Natrium, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00236
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for James M. Hecker. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 9/16/2019. (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee for James Hecker: $ 200.00, receipt number WVNC002704 (nmm)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of James Hecker by Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition, The Sierra Club. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear)(Becher, John)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 10/2/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/16/2019. Discovery due by 11/6/2019. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 9/4/19. (lmm)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Eagle Natrium, LLC.(Weld, Ryan)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Eagle Natrium, LLC served on 8/12/2019. (lmm)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Eagle Natrium, LLC, filed by The Sierra Club, Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition. Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-2873758. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition et al v. Eagle Natrium, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Sierra Club
Represented By: John Michael Becher
Represented By: Derek O Teaney
Represented By: James M. Hecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition
Represented By: John Michael Becher
Represented By: Derek O Teaney
Represented By: James M. Hecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Natrium, LLC
Represented By: Ryan W. Weld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?