Mey v. John Doe Defendant I et al
Plaintiff: Diana Mey
Defendant: John Doe Defendant III, John Doe Defendant I and John Doe Defendant II
Case Number: 5:2019cv00237
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First Amended Class Action Complaint) against John Doe Defendant I, John Doe Defendant II, John Doe Defendant III, filed by Diana Mey.(Barrett, John)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Yvette Golan. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 9/20/2019. (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for William Howard. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 9/4/2019. (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee for William Howard: $ 200.00, receipt number WNVW002277 (nmm)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee for Yvette Golan: $ 200.00, receipt number WVNW002274 (nmm)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Yvette Golan by Diana Mey. (Barrett, John)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for William Howard by Diana Mey. (Barrett, John)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION to Attorney William Howard (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Diana Mey. Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-2873983. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mey v. John Doe Defendant I et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Defendant III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Defendant I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Defendant II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Mey
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Represented By: Jonathan R Marshall
Represented By: William P. Howard
Represented By: Benjamin J. Hogan
Represented By: Yvette Golan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?