Polling v. Wise Services Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Charles Dennis Polling and Charles Dennis Poling
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Co., Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc. and Wise Services Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00238
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Frederick P Stamp
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM upon which relief can be granted filed by Wise Services Inc.. (Chapman, Matthew)
September 26, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM upon which relief can be granted filed by Charles Dennis Poling. (Martin, Joshua)
September 23, 2019 Filing 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Wise Services Inc., filed by Charles Dennis Poling.(Martin, Joshua)
September 23, 2019 Filing 22 Memorandum in Support re #21 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Charles Dennis Poling. (Martin, Joshua)
September 23, 2019 Filing 21 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Charles Dennis Poling. (Martin, Joshua)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER CONFIRMING PRONOUNCED ORDER OF THE COURT FOLLOWING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE DEFENDANTS ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE CO. AND GALLAGHER BASSETT SERVICES, DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANT ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE CO.'S AND GALLAGHER BASSETT SERVICES' MOTIONS TO DISMISS, ESTABLISHING DEADLINES FOR ANY RESPONSE AND REPLY REGARDING DEFENDANT WISE SERVICES, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND ESTABLISHING DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO JOIN RHYS WILLIAMS AS A DEFENDANT: Denying as moot #8 Motion to Dismiss for failure to State a Claim and #9 Motion to Dismiss for failure to State a Claim; Set/Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM upon which relief can be granted. Responses due by 9/30/2019, Replies due by 10/7/2019 re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM upon which relief can be granted filed by Wise Services Inc. ; Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc. and Zurich American Insurance Co. terminated. Amended Complaint to be filed by 9/23/19; joinder of parties/Amended Pleadings due by 1/3/20.(copy of this Order and #19 Order mailed by U.S. mail to Mr. Martin) Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 9/16/19. (soa)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER FOLLOWING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE CONFIRMING PRONOUNCED ORDER OF THE COURT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings/Joinder of Parties due by 1/3/2020. Discovery due by 3/6/2020. Motions due by 3/20/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/21/2020. Pretrial Conference/Final Settlement Conference set for 5/26/2020 10:00 AM in Judge Stamp Chambers before Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp Jr. Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 6/9/2020 08:30 AM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, South before Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp Jr. (soa)
September 16, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE ENTRY: ***NOTICE*** THE ATTACHED DOCUMENT IS NOT ACCESSIBLE. IT IS FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY. Proceedings held before Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr: Scheduling/Status Conference held on 9/16/2019. (Court Reporter Cindy Knecht.) (soa)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SCHEDULING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling/Status Conference set for 9/16/2019 01:30 PM in Judge Stamp Chambers before Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp Jr. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 9/9/19. (copy by regular mail to Joshua R. Martin)(soa)
September 9, 2019 Filing 16 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION re #15 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting mailed to Joshua Martin. (soa)
September 9, 2019 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Chapman, Matthew)
August 16, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 First Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/12/19. (soa)
August 16, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zurich American Insurance Co.. (Chapman, Matthew)
August 16, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc.. (Chapman, Matthew)
August 16, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wise Services Inc.. (Chapman, Matthew)
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 Brief in Support of Other Document re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM upon which relief can be granted, #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM upon which relief can be granted filed by Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc., Zurich American Insurance Co.. (Chapman, Matthew)
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM upon which relief can be granted by Zurich American Insurance Co.. (Chapman, Matthew)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM upon which relief can be granted by Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc.. (Chapman, Matthew)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 Brief in Support of Other Document re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM upon which relief can be granted filed by Wise Services Inc.. (Chapman, Matthew)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM upon which relief can be granted by Wise Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Chapman, Matthew)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/8/19. (soa)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER -- FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 9/10/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/17/2019. Initial Discovery Disclosures due by 10/8/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 8/7/19. (copy to Pltff. by cert. mail)(soa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/7/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (soa).
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT re #1 Notice of Removal, sent by cert. mail to Pltff. (soa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/7/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (soa).
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number WVNW002248. (soa)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Ohio County, WV, (case number 19-C-175) Filing fee paid. Receipt No. WVNW002248, filed by Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc., Zurich American Insurance Co., Wise Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court papers, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(soa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Polling v. Wise Services Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Dennis Polling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Dennis Poling
Represented By: Joshua R. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Co.
Represented By: Edward Joseph Chiodo
Represented By: Matthew Gilbert Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc.
Represented By: Edward Joseph Chiodo
Represented By: Matthew Gilbert Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wise Services Inc.
Represented By: Edward Joseph Chiodo
Represented By: Matthew Gilbert Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?