Kimball v. Arcelormittal - Weirton, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Richard Kimball
Defendant: Arcelormittal USA, LLC and Arcelormittal - Weirton, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00242
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Arcelormittal - Weirton, LLC, Arcelormittal USA, LLC of Defendants' Initial Disclosures. (Hannen, Robert)
October 9, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard Kimball Initial Discovery Disclosures Pursuant to Federal Rule of Procedure 26 (Simon, Michael)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder & Amendments due by 1/31/2020. Discovery due by 6/30/2020. Motions due by 7/27/2020. Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/23/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/12/2020 02:00 PM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, North before District Judge John Preston Bailey. Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 10/20/2020 09:00 AM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, North before District Judge John Preston Bailey. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 9/30/19. (lmm)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hannen, Robert)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Arcelormittal USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hannen, Robert)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Arcelormittal - Weirton, LLC.(Hannen, Robert)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 9/13/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/27/2019. Discovery due by 10/11/2019. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 8/14/19. (lmm)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arcelormittal - Weirton, LLC, Arcelormittal USA, LLC identifying Corporate Parent ArcelorMittal S.A. for Arcelormittal - Weirton, LLC, Arcelormittal USA, LLC.. (Hannen, Robert)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Hannen on behalf of Arcelormittal - Weirton, LLC, Arcelormittal USA, LLC (Hannen, Robert)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Hancock County, (case number 19-C-68), filed by Arcelormittal USA, LLC. Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-2879089. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - CBA, #3 Exhibit C - Consent to Removal, #4 Exhibit D - State Court Record, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(lmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kimball v. Arcelormittal - Weirton, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Kimball
Represented By: Kevin M. Pearl
Represented By: Michael G. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arcelormittal USA, LLC
Represented By: Robert J. Hannen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arcelormittal - Weirton, LLC
Represented By: Robert J. Hannen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?