Ziegler, Inc. v. Welded Construction, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Ziegler, Inc.
Defendant: Welded Construction, L.P. and Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00258
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER CLOSING CASE: Denying as moot #6 Motion to Dismiss for failure to State a Claim; civil action Stricken from active docket of this Court; parties to pay own fees and costs. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 9/26/19. (soa)
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ziegler, Inc. (Cutright, Roger)
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Stipulation for Extension to Respond filed by Ziegler, Inc.. (Cutright, Roger)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 Memorandum in Support re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Meadows, John)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 10/9/2019; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/23/2019; Initial Disclosures due by 11/11/2019. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 9/9/2019. (copy to counsel via cm/ecf and us mail as needed) (nmm) Modified docket text re: service copies on 9/9/2019 (nmm).
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Business Data, #2 Exhibit B - Lower Court Record, #3 Attachment Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Meadows, John)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION re #1 Notice of Removal sent to Andrew Cutright by U. S. mail at 1445 Stewartstown Road, Suite 300, Morgantown, WV 26505. (soa)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 DOCKET SHEET OF U. S. BANKRUPTCY COURT. (soa)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 Transmittal of Record re #2 Order, #1 Notice of Removal. (soa)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER WITHDRAWING REFERENCE; Amended Order of Reference dated 4/2/13 is Withdrawn with regards to captioned adversary proceeding; all future proceedings in the case will be conducted by the undersigned Judge. Bankruptcy Court to transmit copies of this order to parties of interest. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 9/4/19. (soa)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from NDWV Bankruptcy Court, (case number 5:19-ap-00038), filed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC.(soa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ziegler, Inc. v. Welded Construction, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ziegler, Inc.
Represented By: Roger L. Cutright
Represented By: Andrew R. Cutright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Welded Construction, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC
Represented By: John J. Meadows
Represented By: Devon Joseph Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?