Cyrus v. United States of America
Petitioner: Luther Joe Cyrus
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 5:2019cv00260
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Office: Wheeling Office
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: James P Mazzone
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241f
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO DISMISS. (Attachments: #1 2241 Forms) (Pro Se Petitioner via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/5/2019: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
September 5, 2019 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of South Carolina; Case Number 5:19-cv-02259. (lmm)
September 5, 2019 Filing 13 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #12 Opinion and Order Ruling on Report and Recommendation w/NEF, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Luther Joe Cyrus, #99239-071, FCI Hazelton, PO Box 5000, Bruceton Mills, WV 26525. (prou, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 9/5/2019.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 12 OPINION AND ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The court adopts Magistrate Judge West's #8 Report and Recommendation and incorporates it herein. It is therefore ORDERED that this case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia for further consideration. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 9/5/2019. (prou, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 9/5/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION w/NEF, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Luther Joe Cyrus, #99239-071, FCI Hazelton, PO Box 5000, Bruceton Mills, WV 26525. (prou, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 9/5/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The undersigned recommends that this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia for further consideration. Objections to R&R due by 8/28/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 8/14/2019. (prou, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 9/5/2019.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Bruceton Mills, WV. (prou, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 9/5/2019.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Luther Joe Cyrus. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(prou, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 9/5/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cyrus v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Luther Joe Cyrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?