White v. CMH Homes, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mary E. White
Defendant: Andrew Cameon, Doug Bowser, CMH Homes, Inc. and R&J Contracting, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00264
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by R&J Contracting, LLC.(Fenwick, Carrie)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER. Joinder & Amendments due by 2/20/2020. Discovery due by 8/28/2020. Motions due by 9/28/2020. Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/2/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/19/2020 02:00 PM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, North before District Judge John Preston Bailey. Jury Selection /Jury Trial set for 12/1/2020 09:00 AM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, North before District Judge John Preston Bailey. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 10/1/19. (lmm)
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment)(Stemple, Jason)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION re #1 Notice of Removal, extending time to respond to Complaint attached to Notice of Removal by R&J Contracting, LLC. (Fenwick, Carrie)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CMH Homes, Inc., Andrew Cameon. (Stemple, Jason)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by CMH Homes, Inc., Andrew Cameon.(Stemple, Jason)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by CMH Homes, Inc..(Stemple, Jason)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 10/9/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/23/2019. Discovery due by 11/13/2019. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 9/11/19. (lmm)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court Brooke County, (case number 19-C-61), filed by CMH Homes, Inc., Andrew Cameon. Filing Fee PAID $400 - Receipt #0424-2897348 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Docket, #2 Exhibit B - Sales Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Consent, #4 Exhibit D - Consent, #5 Exhibit E - State Court Notice of Removal, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(lmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. CMH Homes, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Cameon
Represented By: Jason J Stemple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Bowser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMH Homes, Inc.
Represented By: Jason J Stemple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R&J Contracting, LLC
Represented By: Carrie Goodwin Fenwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary E. White
Represented By: Sandra K. Law
Represented By: Frank X. Duff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?