Lewis et al v. First Choice America Community Federal Credit Union
Plaintiff: Charn Nandra, Patrick H. Macedonia, Joseph E. Lewis, Satbir Singh, Shalu Singh, Vincent Stonebraker, Patrick G. Rosario, Nicholas P. Mastros, Rafael Schmulevich, Ranjan Bhandari, Samuel D. Licata, Mohammad P. Rahman, Abdullah Kalla, Paul A. DiBiase, Jr. and Jeffrey B. Wilps
Defendant: First Choice America Community Federal Credit Union
Case Number: 5:2019cv00265
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 13 LETTER from Clerk, U. S. District Court to Clerk, Hancock Co. Circuit Court regarding #12 Order on Motion to Remand, Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases, Memorandum & Opinion. (soa)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND: Granting #5 Motion to Remand; and Denying as moot #8 Motion to Consolidate Cases; Case remanded to Circuit Court of Hancock Co., WV. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 11/5/19. (soa)(copy to Clerk of Court of Hancock Co., WV)
October 30, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Nogay, Maximillian)
October 28, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Ranjan Bhandari, Paul A. DiBiase, Jr, Abdullah Kalla, Joseph E. Lewis, Samuel D. Licata, Patrick H. Macedonia, Nicholas P. Mastros, Charn Nandra, Mohammad P. Rahman, Patrick G. Rosario, Rafael Schmulevich, Satbir Singh, Shalu Singh, Vincent Stonebraker, Jeffrey B. Wilps. (Nogay, Maximillian)
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand filed by Ranjan Bhandari, Paul A. DiBiase, Jr, Abdullah Kalla, Joseph E. Lewis, Samuel D. Licata, Patrick H. Macedonia, Nicholas P. Mastros, Charn Nandra, Mohammad P. Rahman, Patrick G. Rosario, Rafael Schmulevich, Satbir Singh, Shalu Singh, Vincent Stonebraker, Jeffrey B. Wilps. (Nogay, Maximillian)
October 14, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by First Choice America Community Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ltr. from Nogay to Pearl dated August 21, 2019)(Pearl, Kevin)
October 14, 2019 Filing 7 Memorandum in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand filed by First Choice America Community Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ltr. from Nogay to Pearl dated August 21, 2019)(Pearl, Kevin)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by First Choice America Community Federal Credit Union DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS. (Pearl, Kevin)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand by Ranjan Bhandari, Paul A. DiBiase, Jr, Abdullah Kalla, Joseph E. Lewis, Samuel D. Licata, Patrick H. Macedonia, Nicholas P. Mastros, Charn Nandra, Mohammad P. Rahman, Patrick G. Rosario, Rafael Schmulevich, Satbir Singh, Shalu Singh, Vincent Stonebraker, Jeffrey B. Wilps. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A through E)(Nogay, Maximillian)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by First Choice America Community Federal Credit Union. (Pearl, Kevin) (Main Document 4 replaced on 9/27/2019) (soa). Modified on 9/27/2019 to make document a non-fillable PDF(soa).
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by First Choice America Community Federal Credit Union.(Pearl, Kevin)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER -- FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 10/16/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/30/2019. Initial Discovery Disclosures due by 11/13/2019. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 9/18/19. (soa)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Hancock Co., WV, (case number 19-C-87). Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #0424-2897380, filed by First Choice America Community Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Attachment State Court Docket Sheet, #2 Attachment State Court Complaint, #3 Attachment Notice of Filing of NOR, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(soa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis et al v. First Choice America Community Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charn Nandra
Represented By: Joseph G. Nogay
Represented By: Maximillian Fitzsimmons Nogay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick H. Macedonia
Represented By: Joseph G. Nogay
Represented By: Maximillian Fitzsimmons Nogay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph E. Lewis
Represented By: Joseph G. Nogay
Represented By: Maximillian Fitzsimmons Nogay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Satbir Singh
Represented By: Joseph G. Nogay
Represented By: Maximillian Fitzsimmons Nogay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shalu Singh
Represented By: Joseph G. Nogay
Represented By: Maximillian Fitzsimmons Nogay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Stonebraker
Represented By: Joseph G. Nogay
Represented By: Maximillian Fitzsimmons Nogay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick G. Rosario
Represented By: Joseph G. Nogay
Represented By: Maximillian Fitzsimmons Nogay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas P. Mastros
Represented By: Joseph G. Nogay
Represented By: Maximillian Fitzsimmons Nogay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Schmulevich
Represented By: Joseph G. Nogay
Represented By: Maximillian Fitzsimmons Nogay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ranjan Bhandari
Represented By: Joseph G. Nogay
Represented By: Maximillian Fitzsimmons Nogay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel D. Licata
Represented By: Joseph G. Nogay
Represented By: Maximillian Fitzsimmons Nogay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad P. Rahman
Represented By: Joseph G. Nogay
Represented By: Maximillian Fitzsimmons Nogay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdullah Kalla
Represented By: Joseph G. Nogay
Represented By: Maximillian Fitzsimmons Nogay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul A. DiBiase, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph G. Nogay
Represented By: Maximillian Fitzsimmons Nogay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey B. Wilps
Represented By: Joseph G. Nogay
Represented By: Maximillian Fitzsimmons Nogay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Choice America Community Federal Credit Union
Represented By: George J Anetakis
Represented By: Kevin M. Pearl
Represented By: Thomas J. Decapio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?