Murunga v. Adams
Petitioner: Anne Murunga
Respondent: Paul Adams
Case Number: 5:2019cv00268
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: James P Mazzone
Referring Judge: Frederick P Stamp
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT (2ND) TO [1-1] EMERGENCY MOTION FOR CONSIDERATION AND/OR TRANSFER TO RESIDENTIAL RE-ENTRY CENTER ("RRC") AND HOME CONFINEMENT PURSUANT TO SECOND CHANCE ACT AND THE FIRST STEP ACT ("FSA") re #8 SUPPLEMENT, and #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Anne Murunga. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(soa)
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT TO EMERGENCY MOTION FOR CONSIDERATION AND/OR TRANSFER TO RESIDENTIAL RE-ENTRY CENTER ("REC") AND HOME CONFINEMENT PURSUANT TO SECOND CHANCE ACT AND THE FIRST STEP ACT ("FSA") re [1-1] Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Anne Murunga. (Attachments: #1 Admin. Remedy, #2 Envelope)(soa)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/25/19. (soa)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT (amending spelling of Petitioner's name on #3 . sent by cert. mail to Petitioner. (soa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (soa).
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER from Anne Murunga to Clerk, U.S. Dristrict Court regarding #3 Notice (Other), requesting correction of spelling of name on #3 Notice. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(soa)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/18/19. (soa)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, mailed by cert. mail to Petitioner. (soa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/16/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (soa).
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number WVNC002705. (soa)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Paul Adams, filed by Anne Murunga. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Subject - Second chance, #2 Table of Contents to Attachments, #3 Attachment 1, #4 Attachment 2, #5 Attachment 3, #6 Attachment 3 (Page 13 of 18), #7 Attachment 4, #8 Attachment 5, #9 Attachment 6, #10 Attachment 7, #11 Attachment 8, #12 Attachment 9, #13 Attachment 10, #14 Attachment 11, #15 Attachment 12, #16 Attachment 13, #17 Cover Letter, #18 Envelope)(soa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murunga v. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anne Murunga
Represented By: Brian J. Kornbrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Paul Adams
Represented By: William J. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?