Pike et al v. Antero Resources Corporation
Plaintiff: Rufus Fordyce Pike, John Kent Pike, Jr. and Daniel Edward Pike
Defendant: Antero Resources Corporation
Case Number: 5:2019cv00276
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Frederick P Stamp
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 23 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court on 11/7/19. (lmm)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT ANTERO RESOURCES CORPORATION'S #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION and denying #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. It is further ORDERED that this civil action be DISMISSED and STRICKEN from the active docket of this Court. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgment on this matter. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 11/7/19. (lmm)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS IN CIVIL ACTION PENDING RESOLUTION OF DEFENDANTS #18 MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 10/22/19. (lmm)
October 17, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss filed by Antero Resources Corporation. (Lawrence, W.)
October 17, 2019 Filing 19 Memorandum in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss filed by Daniel Edward Pike, Rufus Fordyce Pike, John Kent Pike, Jr.. (Ford, William)
October 16, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss by Antero Resources Corporation. (Lawrence, W.)
October 16, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss filed by Antero Resources Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lawrence, W.)
October 9, 2019 Filing 16 Memorandum in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Daniel Edward Pike, Rufus Fordyce Pike, John Kent Pike, Jr.. (Ford, William)
October 8, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Antero Resources Corporation, filed by Rufus Fordyce Pike, John Kent Pike, Jr., Daniel Edward Pike. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Amended Complaint)(Ford, William)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING JOINT #13 MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINES FOR BRIEFING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Responses due by 10/9/2019 and Replies due by 10/16/2019 re #8 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 10/22/2019 and Replies due by 10/29/2019 re #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 10/8/19. (lmm)
October 3, 2019 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Extend Deadlines for Briefing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Antero Resources Corporation. (Lawrence, W.)
October 2, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Daniel Edward Pike, Rufus Fordyce Pike, John Kent Pike, Jr. re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Memorandum in Support thereof, #3 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction against Defendant Antero Resources Corp., #5 MOTION for Hearing re #3 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction against Defendant Antero Resources Corp. and Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents (Ford, William)
October 2, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Antero Resources Corporation served on 9/27/2019. (Ford, William)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED #9 MOTION FOR AMENDED ORDER ON MOTION FOR HEARING DATE AND RESCHEDULING HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2019 01:30 PM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, South before Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp Jr. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 9/27/19. (lmm)
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Amend/Correct #6 Order on Motion for Hearing,,,, Set Motion, Evidentiary, R&R and Social Security Oral Argument Deadlines/Hearings, by Daniel Edward Pike, Rufus Fordyce Pike, John Kent Pike, Jr.. (Ford, William)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Antero Resources Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum of Law in Support of Antero Resources Corporation's Motion to Dismiss)(Rubenstein, Justin)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Antero Resources Corporation. (Rubenstein, Justin)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' #5 MOTION FOR HEARING DATE ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND SCHEDULING HEARING ON #3 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Motion Hearing set for 10/1/2019 12:00 PM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, South before Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp Jr. on 9/25/19. (lmm)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Hearing re #3 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction against Defendant Antero Resources Corp. by Daniel Edward Pike, Rufus Fordyce Pike, John Kent Pike, Jr.. (Ford, William)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 Memorandum in Support thereof by Daniel Edward Pike, Rufus Fordyce Pike, John Kent Pike, Jr.. (Ford, William) Modified on 9/24/2019 to change docket text to "Memorandum" and regenerate NEF(soa).
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction against Defendant Antero Resources Corp. by Daniel Edward Pike, Rufus Fordyce Pike, John Kent Pike, Jr.. (Ford, William)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Antero Resources Corporation, filed by Rufus Fordyce Pike, John Kent Pike, Jr., Daniel Edward Pike. Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-2906717 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deed, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Heirship, #3 Exhibit C - 11/17/14 Letter, #4 Exhibit D - 8/29/19 Letter, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(lmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pike et al v. Antero Resources Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rufus Fordyce Pike
Represented By: William E. Ford, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Kent Pike, Jr.
Represented By: William E. Ford, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Edward Pike
Represented By: William E. Ford, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antero Resources Corporation
Represented By: W. Henry Lawrence
Represented By: Justin A. Rubenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?