Amoroso v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Angela Lynn Amoroso
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 5:2019cv00281
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: James P Mazzone
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND NOTICE GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES AND AFFIDAVIT: Granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Clerk directed to issue summons and send to USM for service. Pltff. to stipulate in an affidavit that any recovery is to be paid to the Clerk. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 11/25/19. (copy to Pltff. by cert. mail)(soa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/25/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (soa). (copy to USM)
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Angela Lynn Amoroso (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(soa)(Address changed in system)
November 7, 2019 Filing 6 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Angela Lynn Amoroso. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter, #2 Envelope)(soa)(Pro Se Packet mailed to Pltff.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/7/2019: #3 Pro Se packet) (soa).
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 Letter. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/31/19. 3(soa) Modified on 11/5/2019 to correct service date and regenerate NEF(soa).
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN RECEIPT as to #2 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/15/19. (soa)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER sent by Certified Mail from Clerk, U. S. District Court, to Angela Lynn Amoroso regarding payment of filing fee for #1 Complaint filed by Angela Lynn Amoroso. (Attachments: #1 Court-Approved IFP form)(soa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/2/2019: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (soa).
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT re #1 Complaint sent to Pltff by cert. mail. (soa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/1/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (soa).
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Angela Lynn Amoroso. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope)(soa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amoroso v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Lynn Amoroso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?