Sean Cameron Coots v. Ford Motor Credit Company LLC
Debtor: Melissa Ann Coots
Appellant: Sean Cameron Coots
Appellee: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00283
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Frederick P Stamp
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE: Appellant memorandum in support of appeal shall be filed on or before December 4, 2019; Appellee response shall be filed on or before January 4, 2020; Any reply brief shall be filed on or before January 18, 2020. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 11/5/2019. (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm)
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DISTRICT COURT'S RECEIPT AND FILING OF DESIGNATED RECORD ON APPEAL AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-01085. (nmm)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 Designated Record on Appeal re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Motion to Dismiss by Ford Motor Credit Co., #3 Meorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #4 Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #5 Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Ford Motor Co., #6 Memorandum Opinion, #7 Order Granting in Part Motion to Dismiss, #8 Notice of Appeal, #9 Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to U.S. District Court, #10 Clerk's Service of Notice of Appeal, #11 Appellant Designation of Contents for Inclusion in Record on Appeal, #12 Statement of Issues on Appeal) (nmm)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 Transmittal of Certificate of Designated Record on Appeal re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal of Record on Appeal) (nmm)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION: Parties have been updated to reflect the Adversary Case Caption. (nmm)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm)
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-01085, as to Sean Cameron Coots, Melissa Ann Coots. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Sheet) (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sean Cameron Coots v. Ford Motor Credit Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Melissa Ann Coots
Represented By: Thomas E. McIntire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Sean Cameron Coots
Represented By: Thomas E. McIntire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC
Represented By: Christopher Anthony Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?