Bowling v. Hudgins
Petitioner: Michael Bowling
Respondent: R. Hudgins
Case Number: 5:2019cv00285
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: James P Mazzone
Referring Judge: Frederick P Stamp
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN RECEIPT as to #11 Order to Show Cause,. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 11/15/19. (soa)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER AND ROSEBORO NOTICE re #12 MOTION to Dismiss ,Or in the Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by R. Hudgins. Within 21 days from the date of this Order, the pro se party shall file any opposition to the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 11/20/19. (copy to Petitioner by cert. mail)(soa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/20/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (soa).
November 19, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss ,Or in the Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment by R. Hudgins. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 to Memorandum and Attachments A through H)(Reisenweber, Erin)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Warden has 28 days to show cause why the writ should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 11/6/19. (soa)(copy to Petitioner by cert. mail)(hard & elec. copies to AUSA Altmeyer) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (soa).
October 29, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN RECEIPT as to #9 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/25/19. (soa)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING MOTION AS MOOT re #6 Petitioner's IFP Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 10/23/2019. (copy to pro se petitioner via cm,rrr; copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/23/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (nmm).
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number WVNW002308 (nmm)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Michael Bowling. (Attachments: #1 Ledger Sheets, #2 Envelope) (copy to Judge Stamp) (nmm)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Bowling. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (copy to Judge Stamp) (nmm)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN RECEIPT as to #2 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT and #3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADIG. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/7/2019. (nmm)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 Attachment No. 19 to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Michael Bowling. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter (First Step), #2 Envelope)(soa) (copy to John Miller, USPO, together with copy of #1 )
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, mailed to Petitioner by cert. mail (Attachments: #1 IFP and PTAR)(soa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/3/2019: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (soa).
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, mailed to Petitioner by cert. mail. (soa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/3/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (soa).
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against R. Hudgins, filed by Michael Bowling. (Attachments: #1 Index of Attachments 1 - 18, #2 Attachment 1, #3 Attachment 2, #4 Attachment 3, #5 Attachment 4, #6 Attachment 5, #7 Attachment 6, #8 Attachment 7, #9 Attachment 8, #10 Attachment 9, #11 Attachment 10, #12 Attachment 11, #13 Attachment 12, #14 Attachment 13, #15 Attachment 14, #16 Attachment 15, #17 Attachment 16, #18 Attachment 17, #19 Attachment 18, #20 Attachment Sentence Monitoring Computation Data, #21 Cover letter, #22 Envelope)(soa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowling v. Hudgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Bowling
Represented By: Brian J. Kornbrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: R. Hudgins
Represented By: Helen Campbell Altmeyer
Represented By: William J. Powell
Represented By: Erin K. Reisenweber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?