Kempker v. F. Entzel
Petitioner: Scott Kempker
Respondent: F. Entzel
Case Number: 5:2019cv00302
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: James P Mazzone
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF by F. Entzel re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Prezioso, Christopher)
December 18, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE,, MOTION for Summary Judgment by F. Entzel. (Prezioso, Christopher)
December 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher James Prezioso on behalf of F. Entzel (Prezioso, Christopher)
November 25, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN RECEIPT as to #8 Order #9 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 11/21/19 per USPS. (lmm)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING #7 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL AND DIRECTING CLERK TO REFILE MOTION IN PETITIONER'S CASE FILED PURSUANT TO THE FEDERAL TORT CLAIMS ACT. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 11/19/19. (Pro Se Petitioner via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/19/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 11/19/19. (Pro Se Petitioner via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/19/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Scott Kempker. (Attachments: #1 11/5/19 Letter from Matthew W. Mellady, #2 Envelope)(lmm)
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Scott Kempker. (Attachments: #1 Ledger Sheets, #2 Envelope)(lmm)
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 Notice, #3 Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/30/2019. (kac)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Attachments: #1 PTAR) (Pro Se Petitioner via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/28/2019: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. (Pro Se Petitioner via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/28/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number WVNC002750 (lmm)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against F. Entzel, filed by Scott Kempker. (Attachments: #1 Report, #2 Attachment, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Envelope)(lmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kempker v. F. Entzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Scott Kempker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: F. Entzel
Represented By: Helen Campbell Altmeyer
Represented By: Christopher James Prezioso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?