Munoz v. Gomez
Petitioner: George Munoz
Respondent: C. Gomez
Case Number: 5:2019cv00304
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: James P Mazzone
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER from Petitioner regarding #4 Filing Fee Received. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmm)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 Notice #2 Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 11/8/19. (lmm)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number WVNE014661 (lmm)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Attachments: #1 2241 - IFP and PTAR forms)(Pro Se Petitioner via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/5/2019: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. (Pro Se Petitioner via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/5/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against C. Gomez, filed by George Munoz. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A - Sentencing Hearing, #3 Exhibit B - Offense Review, #4 Cover Letter, #5 Envelope)(lmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Munoz v. Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: George Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: C. Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?