Zirbs v. Commissioner Of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Melinda Kay Zirbs
Defendant: Commissioner Of Social Security Administration
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 5:2019cv00308
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: Frederick P Stamp
2 Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Filing 6 Case Reassigned to District Judge John Preston Bailey per Order entered in 3:20MC1. Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr no longer assigned to the case. There are no hearings scheduled before the District Judge to be reset at this time. (cmd)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND NOTICE GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES AND AFFIDAVIT: Granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Clerk to issue summons; Plaintiff to stipulate as to recovery in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 12/4/19. (soa)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Melinda Kay Zirbs. (Attachments: #1 Fax Cover Sheet)(cmd)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WITHIN FOURTEEN (14) DAYS WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED: Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 12/2/19. (soa)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (FILING FEE NOT INCLUDED) against Commissioner Of Social Security Administration, filed by Melinda Kay Zirbs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(soa)(Proposed Summons being held in file pending payment of Filing Fee or filing of Order for IFP) Modified on 11/13/2019 to correct filing date (soa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zirbs v. Commissioner Of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melinda Kay Zirbs
Represented By: Jaime Marie Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?