Washington v. Hudgins
Petitioner: Tony Washington, Sr.
Respondent: Richard Hudgins
Case Number: 5:2020cv00086
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: James P Mazzone
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 Filing 21 LETTER from Tony Washington, Sr. to Clerk of Court regarding payment of his fee. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (public docket sheet sent) (lmm)
June 25, 2020 Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone no longer assigned to case pursuant to #20 RR. (lmm)
June 25, 2020 Filing 20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. The undersigned recommends that the #1 petition be DENIED and DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk is directed to terminate the Magistrate Judges association with this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 6/25/20. (Pro Se Petitioner via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/25/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER VACATING ORDER TO PAY FILING FEE. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to return any additional payment that is received from the petitioner for the instant action. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 6/23/20. (Pro Se Petitioner via CM/rrr; Financial Deputy via email) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/25/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
June 23, 2020 Filing 18 RETURN RECEIPT as to #16 Order #17 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 6/19/20. (lmm)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DENYING PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR APPOINTED COUNSEL. Motion to Appoint Counsel #2 is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 6/16/2020. (copy to pro se Petitioner via CM/rrr)(ag) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/16/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 VACATED PURSUANT TO #19 ORDER ------- ORDER denying #13 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. It is ORDERED that the petitioner shall pay the $5.00 filing fee within 21 days of entry of this order. Failure to comply with this Order will result in this matter being dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 6/16/2020. (copy to pro se Petitioner via CM/rrr)(ag) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/16/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm). Modified on 6/23/2020 to vacate order(lmm).
May 26, 2020 Filing 15 LETTER from Tony Washington, Sr. to Clerk requesting copy of docket sheet. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(public docket sheet sent) (lmm)
May 19, 2020 Filing 14 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Tony Washington, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Ledger Sheets, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(lmm)
May 19, 2020 Filing 13 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tony Washington, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(lmm)
May 19, 2020 Filing 12 ELECTION BY PETITIONER TO PROCEED UNDER 28 U.S.C. 2255 OR TO PROCEED AS FILED re #5 Notification filed by Tony Washington, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(lmm)
May 19, 2020 Filing 11 LETTER from Tony Washington, Sr. regarding #5 Notification. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(lmm)
May 12, 2020 Filing 10 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 5/7/20. (lmm)
May 7, 2020 Filing 9 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number WVNC002915 (lmm)
May 7, 2020 Filing 8 LETTER from Tony Washington to Clerk of Court regarding status of case. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (public docket sheet sent) (lmm)
May 7, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 Notice #4 Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 5/4/20 per USPS. (lmm)
May 5, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER from Tony Washington verifying that documents were received with his Petition. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (public docket sheet sent) (lmm)
May 5, 2020 Filing 5 NOTIFICATION TO PETITIONER OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO PROCEED UNDER 28 U.S.C. 2255 OR TO PROCEED AS FILED. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 5/5/20. (Attachments: #1 Election Form) (Pro Se Petitioner via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/5/2020: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Attachments: #1 Attachments B & C of 2241 Form) (Pro Se Petitioner via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/30/2020: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. (Pro Se Petitioner via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/30/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Tony Washington, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmm)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Richard Hudgins, filed by Tony Washington, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Affidavit of Petitioner, #3 Envelope)(lmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. Hudgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tony Washington, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Richard Hudgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?