Hill v. Verizon Wireless, LLC
Plaintiff: Scott E. Hill
Defendant: Verizon Wireless, LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00088
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER. Joinder & Amendments due by 10/15/2020. Discovery due by 2/1/2021. Motions due by 3/15/2021. Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/4/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/10/2021 09:00 AM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, North before District Judge John Preston Bailey. Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 5/18/2021 09:00 AM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, North before District Judge John Preston Bailey. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 6/17/20. (lmm)
June 15, 2020 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Griffith, M.)
May 29, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Verizon Wireless, LLC.(Griffith, M.)
May 11, 2020 Filing 4 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO PLEAD IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT by Verizon Wireless, LLC. (Griffith, M.)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 6/1/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/15/2020. Discovery due by 7/1/2020. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 5/1/20. (lmm)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Verizon Wireless, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Verizon Communications Inc., Other Affiliate Bell Atlantic Mobile Systems LLC,, Other Affiliate GTE Wireless LLC,, Other Affiliate Verizon Americas Inc.;, Other Affiliate GTE Wireless of the Midwest Incorporated, Other Affiliate MCI Communications Services, Inc.;, Other Affiliate GTE LLC, Other Affiliate Verizon Ventures LLC, Other Affiliate NYNEX LLC, for Verizon Wireless, LLC.. (Griffith, M.)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Ohio County, (case number 20-C-70), filed by Verizon Wireless, LLC. Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-3034872. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(lmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Verizon Wireless, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott E. Hill
Represented By: Jason E. Causey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Wireless, LLC
Represented By: M. David Griffith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?