Ozsusamlar v. Adams
Petitioner: Mustafa Ozsusamlar
Respondent: P. Adams
Case Number: 5:2020cv00099
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: James P Mazzone
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Filing 6 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number WVNW002493 (nmm)
June 4, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN RECEIPT as to #2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING and #3 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 5/26/2020 (per usps website). (nmm)
June 2, 2020 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, filed by Mustafa Ozsusamlar. (Attachments: #1 Supporting documentation (SEALED per Judge Bailey), #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Envelope)(nmm) Modified docket text to seal attachment on 6/2/2020 (nmm).
May 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. (copy to pro se Petitioner via CM/rrr) (ag) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/21/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (ag).
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form, #2 Prisoner Trust Account Report, #3 Consent to Collect Fees)(copy to pro se Petitioner via CM/rrr)(ag) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/21/2020: #4 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (ag).
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against P. Adams filed by Mustafa Ozsusamlar. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter/Document List, #2 Complaint Recommendation, #3 Exhibit 1 - Several RIS Requests and Response by BOP Staff, #4 Exhibit 1A - Detainer need to new change or conviction, #5 Exhibit 2 - Counselor Note, #6 Exhibit 3 - FRP Memo Endorsed by Case Judge, #7 Exhibit 4 - DHO Report, #8 Envelope)(ag) Modified on 5/21/2020, attachment 4, exhibit 1A, restricted per Judge Bailey (ag). (Main Document 1 and Attachment 8 replaced on 7/15/2020 to correct filing date to 5/21/2020) (ag)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ozsusamlar v. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mustafa Ozsusamlar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: P. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?