Arnolds v. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Billy Arnolds, Jr.
Defendant: Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2020cv00111
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee for Britney McDonald: $ 200.00, receipt number WVNW002510. (ag)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Billy Arnolds, Jr. Amended Summons. (Hicks, Kenneth) (Main Document 4 replaced on 7/20/2020 with flattened PDF) (ag)
June 16, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Billy Arnolds, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hicks, Kenneth)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company filed by Billy Arnolds, Jr. Filling Fee: $400, receipt #0424-3055109. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ag)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arnolds v. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Arnolds, Jr.
Represented By: Kenneth P. Hicks
Represented By: Britney McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?