Porter et al v. Julian et al
Plaintiff: Tennieal Norman Porter and Tiffany Beaver
Defendant: Eugene J. Julian and Julian Law Firm
Case Number: 5:2020cv00125
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Filing 12 LETTER from Deputy Clerk to Circuit Clerk of Ohio County enclosing #11 ORDER GRANTING JOINDER AND REMAND. (nmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/14/2020: #1 Copy returned signed by Circuit Clerk) (nmm).
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING JOINDER AND REMAND: GRANTING #5 Plaintiffs' Motion (1) to Remand to State Court Or, Alternatively, for Joinder and to Remand to State Court; and (2) to Stay Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, and in the Alternative, to Transfer the Case under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); Julians #3 Motion to Dismiss, and in the Alternative, To Transfer the Case under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) is DENIED AS MOOT. This Court further REMANDS this action to the Circuit Court of Ohio County, West Virginia. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 8/10/2020. (nmm)
July 21, 2020 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Scheduling Order Checklist)(Casey, Patrick)
July 17, 2020 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court or, Alternatively, for Joinder and to Remand to State Court MOTION to Stay Defendants' "Motion to Dismiss, and in the Alternative, to Transfer the Case Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a)" filed by Tiffany Beaver, Tennieal Norman Porter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order)(Casey, Patrick)
July 16, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and, in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer filed by Tiffany Beaver, Tennieal Norman Porter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Proposed Order)(Casey, Patrick)
July 10, 2020 Filing 7 Memorandum in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court or, Alternatively, for Joinder and to Remand to State Court MOTION to Stay Defendants' "Motion to Dismiss, and in the Alternative, to Transfer the Case Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a)" filed by Eugene J. Julian, Julian Law Firm. (Lloyd, Bethann)
July 6, 2020 Filing 6 Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court or, Alternatively, for Joinder and to Remand to State Court MOTION to Stay Defendants' "Motion to Dismiss, and in the Alternative, to Transfer the Case Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a)" filed by Tiffany Beaver, Tennieal Norman Porter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Casey, Patrick)
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court or, Alternatively, for Joinder and to Remand to State Court, MOTION to Stay Defendants' "Motion to Dismiss, and in the Alternative, to Transfer the Case Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a)" by Tiffany Beaver, Tennieal Norman Porter. (Casey, Patrick)
July 2, 2020 Filing 4 Memorandum in Support re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and, in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer filed by Eugene J. Julian, Julian Law Firm. (Lloyd, Bethann)
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and, in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer by Eugene J. Julian, Julian Law Firm. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Lloyd, Bethann)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 7/23/2020; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/6/2020; Initial Disclosures due by 8/20/2020. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 6/25/2020. (copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm)
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Ohio County, West Virginia, (case number 20-C-125), filed by Eugene J. Julian, Julian Law Firm. Filing Fee $400. Receipt #0424-3063253. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of Complaint and Civil Case Information from State Court, #2 Exhibit B - Copy of Notice of Related Filing, #3 Exhibit C - Waiver of Summons and Acceptance of Service, #4 Exhibit D - Entry of Appearance by defense counsel)(copy to counsel via cm/ecf) (nmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/24/2020: #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (nmm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porter et al v. Julian et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tennieal Norman Porter
Represented By: Sandra M. Chapman
Represented By: Patrick S. Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Beaver
Represented By: Sandra M. Chapman
Represented By: Patrick S. Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene J. Julian
Represented By: Bethann R. Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julian Law Firm
Represented By: Bethann R. Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?