Heck v. Adams
Petitioner: Kristen Heck
Respondent: Warden P. Adams
Case Number: 5:2020cv00172
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: James P Mazzone
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Filing 11 RETURN RECEIPT as to #9 Order #10 Clerk's Judgment. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/10/20 per USPS. (lmm)
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court on 9/8/20. (Pro Se Petitioner via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/8/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ADOPTING #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. This Court ORDERS that petitioner's #1 Petition for Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 be DENIED and DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Petitioner's #2 Motion To Proceed in forma pauperis is hereby GRANTED and the #5 Notice of Deficient Pleading is hereby VACATED. This Court further DIRECTS the Clerk to enter judgment in favor of the respondent and to STRIKE this case from the active docket of this Court. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 9/8/20. (Pro Se Petitioner via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/8/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 Notice #5 Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/17/20 per USPS. (lmm)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/17/20 per USPS. (lmm)
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: it is RECOMMENDED that the petitioner's #1 Petition for Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 be DENIED and DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to her right to file a Bivens action; it is RECOMMENDED that the petitioner's #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis be GRANTED and the #5 Notice of Deficient Pleading be VACATED. Written objections may be filed within fourteen days after service of this Report and Recommendation. Failure to file written objections as set forth above shall constitute a waiver of de novo review by the District Court and a waiver of appellate review by the Circuit Court of Appeals. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 8/14/2020. (copy to pro se petitioner via cm,rrr) (nmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/14/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (nmm).
August 13, 2020 Filing 5 VACATED PURSUANT TO #9 ORDER ----- NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Pro Se Petitioner via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/13/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm). Modified on 9/8/2020 to vacate. (lmm).
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. (Pro Se Petitioner via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/13/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Kristen Heck. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmm)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kristen Heck. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmm)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against P. Adams, filed by Kristen Heck. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heck v. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden P. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kristen Heck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?