Luchetti v. SWN Production Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Robert R. Luchetti
Defendant: SWN Production Company, LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00175
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 12 Other Document Scheduling Order Checklist filed by SWN Production Company, LLC. (Marling, Ramonda)
October 5, 2020 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Marling, Ramonda)
September 22, 2020 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Civil Action filed by SWN Production Company, LLC. (Marling, Ramonda)
September 18, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand filed by SWN Production Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Marling, Ramonda)
September 15, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Civil Action filed by Robert R. Luchetti. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cardi, Michael)
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SWN Production Company, LLC identifying parent/other entities: Southwestern Energy Company, Blackrock Inc., FMR LLC and The Vanguard Group, Inc. (Marling, Ramonda) Modified docket text on 9/11/2020; NEF Regenerated (nmm).
September 4, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand by Robert R. Luchetti. (Cardi, Michael)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Civil Action by SWN Production Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memo in Supp MTC Arbitration & Dismiss Civil Action, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Attachment COS to Motion to Compel & Memo in Support)(Marling, Ramonda)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 9/21/2020; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/5/2020; Initial Disclosures due by 10/21/2020. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 8/19/2020. (nmm)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE: it is ORDERED that the above-styled matter be transferred to and placed on the active docket of the Honorable Thomas S. Kleeh. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 8/18/2020. (nmm)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION to Attorney W. Taylor Frankovitch (nmm)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Ohio County, West Virginia, (case number 20-C-151), filed by SWN Production Company, LLC. Filing Fee $400. Receipt #0424-3097372. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - copy of process pleadings, orders, etc. from State Court, #2 Exhibit 2 - Online Data Services for Southwestern Energy Company, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Sara Tate, #4 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Paul Bacho, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (nmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luchetti v. SWN Production Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SWN Production Company, LLC
Represented By: Ramonda C. Marling
Represented By: Richard L. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert R. Luchetti
Represented By: Michael Clarke Cardi
Represented By: W. Taylor Frankovitch
Represented By: William Taylor Frankovitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?