CARD v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Petitioner: CHARLES CARD
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 5:2020cv00176
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: James P Mazzone
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Filing 16 PETITIONER'S/MOVANT'S EX PART REQUET FOR COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by CHARLES CARD. (Attachments: #1 Computation Data, #2 Injunction Evidence, #3 Certification of Service, #4 Envelope)(lmm) Modified on 9/17/2020 to seal exhibit per J. Bailey (lmm).
September 17, 2020 Filing 15 PETITIONER'S EX PARTE REQUEST FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF by CHARLES CARD. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Charles Card, #2 Computation Data, #3 Injunction Evidence, #4 Envelope)(lmm) Modified on 9/17/2020 to seal exhibit per J. Bailey(lmm).
September 17, 2020 Filing 14 Mail sent to Charles Card #7 Notice Returned as Undeliverable. (lmm)
September 17, 2020 Filing 13 RETURN RECEIPT as to #12 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/14/20 per USPS. (lmm)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DISMISSING CASE FOLLOWING NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS. The petitioner's pending #2 #3 #10 #11 motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 9/10/20. (Pro Se Petitioner's via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Main Document 12 replaced on 9/10/2020 to correct error) (lmm). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/10/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
September 2, 2020 Filing 11 PETITIONER'S EX PARTE REQUEST FOR SERVICE BY THE U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE re #10 MOTION by CHARLES CARD. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/17/2020: #2 Certificate of Service) (lmm).
September 2, 2020 Filing 10 PETITIONER'S EX PARTE REQUEST FOR EXTENTION OF TIME TO TIMELY REFILE HIS DEFICIENT 28 U.S.C. 2241 HABEAS CORPUS PETITION filed by CHARLES CARD. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmm)
August 28, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN RECEIPT as to #7 Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/24/20. (lmm)
August 25, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN RECEIPT as to #7 Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/21/20. (lmm)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO DISMISS. (Attachments: #1 2241 Packet) (Pro Se Petitioner via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2020: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:20-cv-01648. (lmm)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE FORTHWITH to the USDC for the Northern District of West Virginia. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 9/8/2020. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/19/2020. (adh, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/19/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Transfer Case by CHARLES CARD (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/19/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by CHARLES CARD (Attachments: #1 Amended Petition, #2 Affidavit)(zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/19/2020.]
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CHARLES CARD (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/19/2020.]
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by CHARLES CARD. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit)(zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/19/2020.]
July 2, 2020 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 07/02/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CARD v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CHARLES CARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?