Ickes et al v. Great American Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Judi Ickes and Harry D. Ickes
Defendant: Great American Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2020cv00177
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 10/15/2020. (nmm)
October 14, 2020 Filing 6 Agreed Order of Dismissal by Great American Insurance Company. (Torbert, Mikaela) Modified docket text on 10/15/2020 as document is a proposed Order; Motion terminated; NEF Regenerated (nmm).
October 1, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Settlement by Great American Insurance Company (Torbert, Mikaela)
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Great American Insurance Company -a wholly owned subsidiary of American Financial Group Inc. (Torbert, Mikaela) Modified docket text re: subsidiary on 8/26/2020 (nmm).
August 26, 2020 Filing 3 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint Torbert, Mikaela by Great American Insurance Company.(Torbert, Mikaela)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULIN G CONFERENCE: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 9/17/2020; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/1/2020; Initial Disclosures due by 10/15/2020. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 8/21/2020. (nmm)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Brooke County, West Virginia, (case number 20-C-38), filed by Great American Insurance Company. Filing Fee $400. Receipt #0424-3099448. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of Summons, Civil Case Information Statement and Complaint filed in State Court, #2 Exhibit B - Copy of WV Secretary of State's service of process materials, #3 Exhibit C - Articles of Incorporation, #4 Exhibit D - Occupational Accident Schedule of Benefits, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (nmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ickes et al v. Great American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judi Ickes
Represented By: Daniel P. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry D. Ickes
Represented By: Daniel P. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Insurance Company
Represented By: Mikaela D. Torbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?