Conley v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Mary Elizabeth Conley
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 5:2021cv00031
Filed: February 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kelly Chermack. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 4/26/2021. (nmm)
April 15, 2021 Filing 30 PHV Filing fee for Kelly Chermack: $ 200.00, receipt number WVNW002718. (ag)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder & Amendments due by 5/10/2021; Discovery due by 12/31/2021; Motions due by 1/28/2022; Responses due by 2/18/2022; Replies due by 2/28/2022; Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/11/2022; Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/25/2022 2:00 PM in Wheeling, WV; Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 5/10/2022 9:00 AM in Wheeling, WV. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 4/13/2021. (ag)
April 12, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Application for Pro Hac Vice Kelly Chermack by Mary Elizabeth Conley. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment)(Zatezalo, J.)
April 12, 2021 Filing 27 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bird, Melissa)
April 12, 2021 Filing 26 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION to Kelly Chermack. (ag)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL #23 . Attorney Arati C Furness and Matthew Ryan McCarley terminated. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 4/12/2021. (ag)
April 12, 2021 Filing 24 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel by Mary Elizabeth Conley. (Zatezalo, J.)
April 12, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Mary Elizabeth Conley. (Zatezalo, J.)
April 12, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Zachary Zatezalo on behalf of Mary Elizabeth Conley (Zatezalo, J.)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL #18 . Attorney Richard B North, Jr terminated. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 3/2/2021. (ag)
March 1, 2021 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Bird, Melissa) (Main Document 20 replaced with flattened PDF on 3/1/2021) (ag)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 3/29/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/12/2021. Discovery due by 4/26/2021. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 3/1/2021. (ag)
March 1, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Bird, Melissa)
March 1, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Foster Bird on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Bird, Melissa)
February 26, 2021 Filing 16 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION. All counsel of record via cm/ecf. (ag)
February 26, 2021 Filing 15 Discovery Orders. (Attachments: docket entries #1 000519, #2 001259, #3 001319, #4 001663, #5 002238, #6 002239, #7 003214, #8 003272, #9 003312, #10 003313, #11 003314, #12 003372, #13 003398, #14 003685, #15 004015, #16 004311, #17 004335, #18 004339, #19 004865, #20 004866, #21 005770, #22 005881, #23 005883, #24 006227, #25 006799)(ag)
February 26, 2021 Filing 14 Case Management Orders. (Attachments: docket entries #1 000249, #2 000314, #3 000363, #4 000365, #5 000372, #6 000401, #7 000519, #8 000927, #9 001108, #10 001259, #11 001319, #12 001485, #13 001662, #14 001663, #15 002238, #16 002239, #17 003214, #18 003215, #19 003372, #20 003685, #21 004015, #22 004016, #23 004141, #24 004311, #25 004335, #26 004866, #27 005007, #28 005285, #29 005770, #30 005881, #31 005883, #32 006227, #33 006799, #34 008113, #35 008871, #36 009415, #37 009775, #38 010323, #39 011011, #40 011320, #41 011659, #42 011871, #43 012061, #44 012830, #45 012853, #46 012971, #47 013329, #48 015098, #49 015176, #50 016343, #51 017494)(ag)
February 26, 2021 Filing 13 Miscellaneous Orders. (Attachments: docket entries #1 008872, #2 008874, #3 010404, #4 010587, #5 011321, #6 011659, #7 011871, #8 012007, #9 012061, #10 012202, #11 012589, #12 012593, #13 012853, #14 012971, #15 017008, #16 018038)(ag)
February 26, 2021 Filing 12 Daubert Orders. (Attachments: docket entries #1 009432, #2 009433, #3 009434, #4 009770, #5 009771, #6 009772, #7 009773, #8 009991, #9 010051, #10 010052, #11 010072, #12 010230, #13 010231, #14 016992, #15 017285)(ag)
February 26, 2021 Filing 11 Master and Short-Form Pleadings. (Attachments: docket entries #1 000303-2, #2 000363, #3 000364, #4 000365, #5 000366, #6 000927, #7 001108, #8 001153-1, #9 001153-2, #10 001485)(ag)
February 26, 2021 Filing 10 Discovery and Privilege Orders. (Attachments: docket entries #1 000699, #2 002813, #3 004865, #4 006799, #5 008113, #6 008315)(ag)
February 26, 2021 Filing 9 Deposition Designation Orders. (Attachments: docket entries #1 010403, #2 010438, #3 010486, #4 010497, #5 010524, #6 010922, #7 011064, #8 011073, #9 011080, #10 011313, #11 012357, #12 012508, #13 012590, #14 012595, #15 012598, #16 017386, #17 017513, #18 017582)(ag)
February 26, 2021 Filing 8 Motions in Limine Orders. (Attachments: docket entries #1 009775, #2 009861, #3 009881, #4 010075, #5 010235, #6 010258, #7 010382, #8 010489, #9 010819, #10 010920, #11 010947, #12 011041, #13 011082, #14 011256, #15 012507, #16 012533, #17 017285, #18 017401)(ag)
February 26, 2021 Filing 7 U.S. District Court District of Arizona (Phoenix Division) Civil Docket for Case 2:15-md-02641. (ag)
February 26, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). (ag) (Main Document 6 replaced on 3/16/2021 to remove double header) (ag)
February 26, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:18-cv-04814. (ag)
February 26, 2021 Remark: Transferring Case to the Northern District of West Virginia via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/26/2021.]
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/26/2021.]
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 *AMENDED By Doc. #4 *SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/19/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from Arizona on 2/26/2021.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-18-04814-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/26/2021.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16332517 filed by Mary Elizabeth Conley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/26/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conley v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Megan B. Davis
Represented By: Melissa Foster Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Megan B. Davis
Represented By: Melissa Foster Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Elizabeth Conley
Represented By: Arati C Furness
Represented By: Matthew Ryan McCarley
Represented By: J. Zachary Zatezalo
Represented By: Kelly Chermack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?