Harris v. R. M. Wolfe
Petitioner: Stephen K. Harris
Respondent: R. M. Wolfe
Case Number: 5:2021cv00052
Filed: April 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: James P Mazzone
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2021 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia (WVND) will be upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) on July 19, 2021. Complete information regarding the WVND NextGen CM/ECF implementation can be found #here.Currently, many attorneys within a firm may share a single PACER account. This will no longer be allowed with the New WVND NextGen CM/ECF system because each attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account that will be linked to their e-filing account. Shared PACER accounts cannot be used by WVND e-filing attorneys once the WVND NextGen CM/ECF system is implemented. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one is to upgrade your PACER account, and step two is to link your upgraded PACER account to the WVND e-filing account in the upgraded NextGen CM/ECF system. This notice only addresses the first step because the second step cant be completed until on or after July 19, 2021. The first step is to check and see if your PACER account is an upgraded PACER account. Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. If any of the following is true, you have un upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the WVND NextGen CM/ECF upgrade occurs on July 19, 2021: 1) You have a an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court; or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If none of these are true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you will be able to link your PACER account to your current WVND CM/ECF account for your new NextGen CM/ECF account. Additional notices will be sent later detailing how to handle the second step in this process. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6856 or the WVND Clerks Office CM/ECF Help Desk at (304) 267-5682. (cmd) (ADI)
May 17, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan McKee (USA) on behalf of R. M. Wolfe (McKee (USA), Morgan)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER AND NOTICE re #1 : the respondent shall file an Answer to the allegations contained in the petitioner's section 2241 petition and to show cause, if any, why the writ of habeas corpus sought by the petitioner should not be granted due by 6/28/2021; the petitioner may file a Reply to the respondent's Answer by 7/28/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 5/14/2021. (ag)(pro se PET CM rrr, AUSA Potter US Mail and CM/ECF) Modified on 5/14/2021 to add relationship to #1 .(ag) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/17/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (ag).
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING MOTION AS MOOT #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 5/14/2021. (ag)(pro se PET CM rrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/17/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (ag).
May 13, 2021 Filing 7 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number WVNM001840. (ag)
April 21, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 Notice #5 Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 4/17/21. (lmm)
April 9, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Attachments: #1 Attach. B & C of 2241 Form) (Pro Se Petitioner via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/12/2021: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
April 9, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. (Pro Se Petitioner via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/12/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
April 9, 2021 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Stephen K. Harris. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmm)
April 9, 2021 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Stephen K. Harris. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmm)
April 9, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against R. M. Wolfe, filed by Stephen K. Harris. (Attachments: #1 Remedy Records, #2 Remedy Response, #3 Envelope)(lmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. R. M. Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: R. M. Wolfe
Represented By: Morgan McKee (USA)
Represented By: Sharon L. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stephen K. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?