Riggs v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Lucinda Diane Riggs
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 5:2021cv00111
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: James P Mazzone
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Commissioner of Social Security served on 7/27/2021; U.S. Attorney General served on 7/29/2021; U.S. Attorney NDWV served on 7/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 U.S. Attorney General, #2 U.S. Attorney NDWV)(ag)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND NOTICE GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES AND AFFIDAVIT #2 . Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 7/19/2021. (ag)
July 13, 2021 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lucinda Diane Riggs. (ag)
July 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Lucinda Diane Riggs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ag) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/13/2021 NEF regenerated: #2 Summons, #3 USM 285 Forms) (ag)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riggs v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucinda Diane Riggs
Represented By: Jan Dils
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?