Fuller v. Hudgins et al
Defendant: Service List
Petitioner: William Fuller, III
Respondent: R. Hudgins
Case Number: 5:2021cv00202
Filed: December 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: James P Mazzone
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO DISMISS. (Attachments: #1 2241 Form) (Pro Se Petitioner via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/6/2021: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
December 3, 2021 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:21-cv-06019. (lmm)
December 3, 2021 Filing 5 TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of West Virginia the electronic record. (kl, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 12/6/2021.]
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 11/19/2021: The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia. See 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and 1631; see also United States v. Prevatte, 300 F.3d 792, 802 (7th Cir. 2002). Petitioner William Fuller is a federal prisoner confined at the United States Penitentiary at Hazelton in West Virginia. Although he was convicted and sentenced in this Court, he has filed a 28 U.S.C. 2241 petition, which must be brought in the district court where his immediate custodian (the warden of his facility) is located. See 2241(a); Rumsfeld v. Padilla, 542 U.S. 426, 447 (2004) (venue and jurisdiction under 2241 is proper where the petitioner is in custody and where his custodian is located). The West Virginia district court is advised that Petitioner filed a 28 U.S.C. 2255 motion in this Court at the same time he filed his 2241 petition. See United States v. Fuller, No. 21 C 6022 (N.D. Ill.) (Kendall, J.). This case is closed. Mailed notice (dal, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 12/6/2021.]
November 10, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION by Petitioner William Fuller, III for attorney representation (exr, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 12/6/2021.]
November 10, 2021 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (exr, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 12/6/2021.]
November 10, 2021 Filing 1 RECEIVED PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by William Fuller, III against R. Hudgins (Exhibits) (Envelope postmarked 11/1/2021) (exr, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 12/6/2021.]
November 10, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. FEE DUE, NO INFORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION SUBMITTED. Case assignment: Random assignment. (exr, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 12/6/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fuller v. Hudgins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William Fuller, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Service List
Represented By: Prisoner Correspondence 12 - Internal Use Only
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: R. Hudgins
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?