Guerrero v. Pollack et al
Plaintiff: Modesto Santo Guerrero
Defendant: Tonya Pollack, G. Robert Thompson and Wexford Health Services
Case Number: 5:2022cv00004
Filed: January 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: James P Mazzone
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO RESPOND. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 3/2/22. (Pro Se Plaintiff via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/2/2022: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
February 28, 2022 Filing 24 Memorandum in Support re #23 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Tonya Pollack, G. Robert Thompson, Wexford Health Services. (Herrick, Jordan)
February 28, 2022 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss by Tonya Pollack, G. Robert Thompson, Wexford Health Services. (Herrick, Jordan)
February 16, 2022 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Wexford Health Services served on 2/10/2022. (lmm)
February 16, 2022 Filing 21 RETURN RECEIPT as to #11 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 2/10/22. (lmm)
February 15, 2022 Filing 20 RETURN RECEIPT as to #9 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 2/3/22. (lmm)
February 14, 2022 Filing 19 RETURN RECEIPT as to #11 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 2/7/22 per USPS. (lmm)
February 11, 2022 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to G. Robert Thompson served on 2/7/2022 per USPS. (lmm)
February 11, 2022 Filing 17 RETURN RECEIPT as to #11 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 2/7/22 per USPS. (lmm)
February 9, 2022 Filing 16 RETURN RECEIPT as to #11 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 2/7/22 per USPS. (lmm)
February 9, 2022 Filing 15 LETTER from Plaintiff regarding #9 Order. (Attachments: #1 Request, #2 Envelope) (copy of #10 receipt sent to Plaintiff) (lmm)
February 9, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Tonya Pollack served on 2/7/2022 per USPS. (lmm)
February 8, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan K. Herrick on behalf of Tonya Pollack, G. Robert Thompson, Wexford Health Services (Herrick, Jordan)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING SERVICE OF PROCESS. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order, a copy of the Complaint, and a completed 21 day summons to each defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, restricted delivery. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 2/3/22. (Pro Se Plaintiff via CM/rrr; Defendants via CM/rrr Restricted Delivery) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/3/2022: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/3/2022: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/3/2022: #3 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/3/2022: #4 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
February 3, 2022 Filing 10 Copies and Certified Mail Reimbursement per DE #9 : $ 69.18, receipt number WVNE017399 (lmm)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. This Order is being entered for the sole purpose of correcting the error in #5 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 2/1/22. (Pro Se Plaintiff via CM/rrr; Financial Administrator via email) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/1/2022: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
January 21, 2022 Filing 8 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 Order #6 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 1/18/22. (lmm)
January 12, 2022 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 1/10/22 per USPS. (lmm)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S #2 MOTION FOR APPOINTED COUNSEL AND AN INTERPRETOR. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 1/11/22. (Pro Se Plaintiff via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2022: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING PRELIMINARY REVIEW AND SERVICE OF PROCESS. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 1/11/22. (Pro Se Plaintiff via CM/rrr; Financial Administrator via email) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2022: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
January 6, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. (Pro Se Plaintiff via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/6/2022: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
January 6, 2022 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number WVNE017320. (lmm)
January 6, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL AND INTERPRETER by Modesto Santo Guerrero. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmm)
January 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tonya Pollack, G. Robert Thompson, Wexford Health Services, filed by Modesto Santo Guerrero. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Filing, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(lmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guerrero v. Pollack et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Modesto Santo Guerrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonya Pollack
Represented By: Samuel Martin Bloom
Represented By: Jordan K. Herrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Robert Thompson
Represented By: Samuel Martin Bloom
Represented By: Jordan K. Herrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Services
Represented By: Samuel Martin Bloom
Represented By: Jordan K. Herrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?