Martin v. United States of America
Plaintiff: James A. Martin
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 5:2022cv00022
Filed: February 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: James P Mazzone
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2022 Filing 14 ** SEALED ** SECOND Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by James A. Martin. (Attachments: #1 Ledger Sheet, #2 copy of DE 10 Order, #3 Envelope)(lmm)
March 21, 2022 Filing 13 RETURN RECEIPT as to #10 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 3/14/22 per USPS. (lmm)
March 15, 2022 Filing 12 ** SEALED ** LEDGER SHEETS by James A. Martin. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmm)
March 15, 2022 Filing 11 RETURN RECEIPT as to #9 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 3/7/22. (lmm)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REQUESTING THE WARDEN'S ASSISTANCE TO ENSURE THAT TRUSTEE CLERK COMPLETES A PRISONER TRUST ACCOUNT REPORT. The Warden is further requested to ensure that the PTAR and ledger sheets are mailed to the Court within fourteen (14) days of entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 3/8/2022. (Attachments: #1 PTAR form)(ag) (pro se PLA cm rrr, order only; Warden USP Beaumont US Mail order and PTAR form) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/8/2022: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. Plaintiff's pro se #8 Motion for Appointment of Counsel is hereby DENIED. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 3/1/22. (Pro Se Plaintiff via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/1/2022: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
February 25, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by James A. Martin. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (copy to K. Criswell via email for Local Rules) (lmm)
February 17, 2022 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 Notice #6 Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 2/8/22. (lmm)
February 4, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Pro Se Plaintiff via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/4/2022: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
February 4, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. (Pro Se Plaintiff via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/4/2022: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
February 4, 2022 Filing 4 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by James A. Martin. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmm)
February 4, 2022 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by James A. Martin. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmm)
February 4, 2022 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James A. Martin. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmm)
February 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America, filed by James A. Martin. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James A. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?