Heard et al v. West Virginia United Health System, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dominique Heard, Amanda Luzader and Kenneth Miklich
Defendant: West Virginia United Health System, Inc., West Virginia University Hospitals, Inc., Community Health Association doing business as Jackson General Hospital, United Hospital Center, Inc., The Charles Town General Hospital Corp. doing business as Jefferson Memorial Hospital, Inc., Camden Clark Memorial Hospital, Inc., City Hospital, Inc., Potomac Valley Hospital, Inc., Grant Memorial Hospital, Inc., Reynolds Memorial Hospital, Inc., The West Virginia, Health Care Cooperative, Inc., Braxton County Memorial Hospital, Inc., St. Joseph's Hospital of Buckhannon, Inc., Wetzel County Hospital, Inc., Wheeling Hospital, Inc., WVUHS Home Care, LLC., West Virginia University Hospitals East, Inc., Camden-Clark Health Services, Inc., United Summit Center, Inc., United Physicians Care, Inc., Camden-Clark Physician Corp., Fayette Physician Network, Inc., Thomas Health System, Inc., Princeton, Community Hospital Assn., Inc., Barnesville Hospital Association, Inc., Uniontown Hospital, Inc., Harrison Community Hospital, Inc., Wheeling Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC, Garrett County Memorial Hospital, Inc. and Allied Health Services, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2023cv00230
Filed: June 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2023 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dominique Heard, Kenneth Miklich, Amanda Luzader. All Defendants. (Petsonk, Samuel)
August 9, 2023 Filing 16 Other Document Notice of Filing Request to Become Party Plaintiff Forms filed by Dominique Heard, Amanda Luzader, Kenneth Miklich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Request to Become Party Plaintiff Forms)(Petsonk, Samuel)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Lauren P. McDermott. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 8/9/2023. (ag)
August 9, 2023 Filing 14 PHV FILING FEE FOR LAUREN MCDERMOTT: $ 200.00, receipt number 500003345 (ag)
August 4, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lauren P. McDermott by Dominique Heard, Amanda Luzader, Kenneth Miklich. (Petsonk, Samuel) Modified on 8/4/2023 to event type. (ag)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Arthur Traynor. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 7/25/2023. (ag)
July 24, 2023 Filing 11 LETTER from Deputy Clerk to Gretchen Waller (Legal Assistant) returning check for PHV Fees for Lauren McDermott as PHV Application has not been filed as of this date. (nmm)
July 24, 2023 Filing 10 PHV FILING FEE FOR ARTHUR TRAYNOR: $ 200.00, receipt number 500003330 (ag)
June 29, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE by Dominique Heard, Amanda Luzader, Kenneth Miklich re #4 Other Document Filing of Additional Forms Requesting to Become Party Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Additional Plaintiff Consents)(Petsonk, Samuel)
June 27, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark H. Dellinger on behalf of All Defendants (Dellinger, Mark)
June 27, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin M Harrison on behalf of All Defendants (Harrison, Justin)
June 21, 2023 Filing 6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Arthur Traynor Other Document filed by Dominique Heard, Amanda Luzader, Kenneth Miklich. (Petsonk, Samuel) Modified on 6/21/2023 to correct filing event to MOTION for Leave to Appear, NEF regenerated (ag)
June 20, 2023 Filing 5 Amended Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons Other Document re #1 Complaint, filed by Dominique Heard, Amanda Luzader, Kenneth Miklich. (Petsonk, Samuel)
June 16, 2023 Filing 4 Appendix B (Plaintiff Consents) Other Document re #1 Complaint, filed by Dominique Heard, Amanda Luzader, Kenneth Miklich. (Petsonk, Samuel)
June 16, 2023 Filing 3 Appendix A (Selected Policies) Other Document re #1 Complaint, filed by Dominique Heard, Amanda Luzader, Kenneth Miklich. (Petsonk, Samuel)
June 16, 2023 Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION to Arthur R. Traynor and Lauren McDermott by cm/ecf. (ag)
June 15, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Dominique Heard, Kenneth Miklich, Amanda Luzader. Filing Fee $402. Receipt #AWVNDC-3736953. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 AO 398 -Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons)(ag)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heard et al v. West Virginia United Health System, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominique Heard
Represented By: Arthur R. Traynor
Represented By: Lauren McDermott
Represented By: Samuel B. Petsonk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Luzader
Represented By: Arthur R. Traynor
Represented By: Lauren McDermott
Represented By: Samuel B. Petsonk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Miklich
Represented By: Samuel B. Petsonk
Represented By: Arthur R. Traynor
Represented By: Lauren McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Virginia United Health System, Inc.
Represented By: Justin M Harrison
Represented By: Mark H. Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Virginia University Hospitals, Inc.
Represented By: Justin M Harrison
Represented By: Mark H. Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Health Association doing business as Jackson General Hospital
Represented By: Justin M Harrison
Represented By: Mark H. Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Hospital Center, Inc.
Represented By: Justin M Harrison
Represented By: Mark H. Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Charles Town General Hospital Corp. doing business as Jefferson Memorial Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Justin M Harrison
Represented By: Mark H. Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camden Clark Memorial Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Justin M Harrison
Represented By: Mark H. Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Justin M Harrison
Represented By: Mark H. Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Potomac Valley Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Justin M Harrison
Represented By: Mark H. Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant Memorial Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Justin M Harrison
Represented By: Mark H. Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reynolds Memorial Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Justin M Harrison
Represented By: Mark H. Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The West Virginia, Health Care Cooperative, Inc.
Represented By: Justin M Harrison
Represented By: Mark H. Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Braxton County Memorial Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Mark H. Dellinger
Represented By: Justin M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Joseph's Hospital of Buckhannon, Inc.
Represented By: Justin M Harrison
Represented By: Mark H. Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wetzel County Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Justin M Harrison
Represented By: Mark H. Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wheeling Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Justin M Harrison
Represented By: Mark H. Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WVUHS Home Care, LLC.
Represented By: Justin M Harrison
Represented By: Mark H. Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Virginia University Hospitals East, Inc.
Represented By: Justin M Harrison
Represented By: Mark H. Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camden-Clark Health Services, Inc.
Represented By: Justin M Harrison
Represented By: Mark H. Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Summit Center, Inc.
Represented By: Justin M Harrison
Represented By: Mark H. Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Physicians Care, Inc.
Represented By: Justin M Harrison
Represented By: Mark H. Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camden-Clark Physician Corp.
Represented By: Mark H. Dellinger
Represented By: Justin M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fayette Physician Network, Inc.
Represented By: Justin M Harrison
Represented By: Mark H. Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Health System, Inc.
Represented By: Justin M Harrison
Represented By: Mark H. Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Princeton, Community Hospital Assn., Inc.
Represented By: Justin M Harrison
Represented By: Mark H. Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnesville Hospital Association, Inc.
Represented By: Justin M Harrison
Represented By: Mark H. Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uniontown Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Mark H. Dellinger
Represented By: Justin M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrison Community Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Justin M Harrison
Represented By: Mark H. Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wheeling Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC
Represented By: Justin M Harrison
Represented By: Mark H. Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garrett County Memorial Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Justin M Harrison
Represented By: Mark H. Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Health Services, Inc.
Represented By: Mark H. Dellinger
Represented By: Justin M Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?