Williams Ohio Valley Midstream, LLC v. Kittle et al
Plaintiff: Williams Ohio Valley Midstream, LLC
Defendant: Phillip A. Kittle and Deborah K. Kittle
Case Number: 5:2023cv00310
Filed: September 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2023 Filing 27 RESPONSE to Motion re #24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Williams Ohio Valley Midstream, LLC. (Schulz, Mychal)
November 13, 2023 Filing 26 USCA NOTICE OF APPELLATE CASE OPENING: re #22 Notice of Appeal filed by Deborah K. Kittle, Phillip A. Kittle. USCA Fourth Circuit USCA Case Number: 23-2185. Case Manager: Richard H. Sewell (804-916-2702). (nmm)
November 9, 2023 Filing 25 Memorandum in Support re #24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Deborah K. Kittle, Phillip A. Kittle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Llaguno, Joy)
November 9, 2023 Filing 24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Deborah K. Kittle, Phillip A. Kittle. (Llaguno, Joy)
November 8, 2023 Filing 23 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #22 Notice of Appeal (ag)
November 8, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #21 Order by Deborah K. Kittle, Phillip A. Kittle. Filing fee $; 505, receipt number AWVNDC-3823212. Appeal Record due by 12/18/2023. (Llaguno, Joy)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 11/1/2023. (ag)
October 19, 2023 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Deborah K. Kittle, Phillip A. Kittle, filed by Williams Ohio Valley Midstream, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Schulz, Mychal)
October 18, 2023 Filing 19 TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER by Williams Ohio Valley Midstream, LLC, for proceedings held on 10/17/2023 before Judge John Preston Bailey. (rak)
October 18, 2023 Filing 18 TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER by Phillip A. Kittle and Deborah K. Kittle for proceedings held on 10/17/2023 before Judge John Preston Bailey. (rak)
October 18, 2023 Filing 17 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/17/2023 before Judge John Preston Bailey. Court Reporter/Transcriber Rachel Kocher, Telephone number (304) 623-7179. Parties have five business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will become available via PACER to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.. Redaction Request due 11/8/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/20/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/16/2024. (rak)
October 17, 2023 Filing 16 MINUTE ENTRY: ***NOTICE*** THE ATTACHED DOCUMENT IS NOT ACCESSIBLE. IT IS FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY. A Motion Hearing re #4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order was held before District Judge John Preston Bailey on 10/17/2023. (Court Reporter Rachel Kocher.) (bjt) Modified on 10/18/2023 to add link for Motion. (bjt).
October 16, 2023 Filing 15 Memorandum in Opposition re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Deborah K. Kittle, Phillip A. Kittle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Opposition, #2 Exhibit 2 to Opposition, #3 Affidavit of Philip Kittle and Exhibits A-E)(Llaguno, Joy)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #12 Motion to Continue; The hearing is SCHEDULED for 10/17/2023 at 2:00 p.m., in the United States District Court, North Courtroom, Wheeling, WestVirginia, taking place before the undersigned. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 10/16/2023. (ag)
October 16, 2023 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 Second MOTION to Continue TRO Hearing filed by Williams Ohio Valley Midstream, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Schulz, Mychal)
October 13, 2023 Filing 12 Second MOTION to Continue TRO Hearing by Deborah K. Kittle, Phillip A. Kittle. (Llaguno, Joy)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting in part #10 Motion to Continue; The hearing re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order is RESCHEDULED for 10/17/2023 2:00 PM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, North before District Judge John Preston Bailey. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 10/13/2023. (ag)
October 12, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Continue October 18, 2023 Hearing Due to Scheduling Conflicts by Deborah K. Kittle, Phillip A. Kittle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Proposed Order)(Llaguno, Joy) (Attachments 6 and 8 replaced on 10/13/2023 due to processing error; Additional attachment(s) added on 10/13/2023: #10 Fax Cover Sheet; NEF regenerated) (ag)
October 3, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Deborah K. Kittle served on 10/2/2023. (Schulz, Mychal)
October 3, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Phillip A. Kittle served on 10/2/2023. (Schulz, Mychal)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING HEARING re #4 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Williams Ohio Valley Midstream, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 10/18/2023 10:00 AM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, North before District Judge John Preston Bailey. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 10/2/2023. (ag)
October 2, 2023 Filing 6 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number 500003388 (ag)
October 2, 2023 Filing 5 Memorandum in Support re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Williams Ohio Valley Midstream, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Schulz, Mychal)
October 2, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by Williams Ohio Valley Midstream, LLC. (Schulz, Mychal)
October 2, 2023 Filing 2 VERIFICATION filed by Williams Ohio Valley Midstream, LLC. (ag)(received by fax)
September 29, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Deborah K. Kittle, Phillip A. Kittle, filed by Williams Ohio Valley Midstream, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ag)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams Ohio Valley Midstream, LLC v. Kittle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Williams Ohio Valley Midstream, LLC
Represented By: Mychal S Schulz
Represented By: Robert M. Stonestreet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip A. Kittle
Represented By: Joy D. Llaguno
Represented By: Matthew Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah K. Kittle
Represented By: Joy D. Llaguno
Represented By: Matthew Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?