Waters v. Ray
Petitioner: Gregory A. Waters
Respondent: Mrs. H. Ray
Case Number: 5:2023cv00330
Filed: October 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: James P Mazzone
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Or in the Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment by H. Ray. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Shaw Declaration, #3 Attachment A to Exhibit 1, #4 Attachment B to Exhibit 1, #5 Attachment C to Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2 - Gregg Declaration, #7 Attachment A to Exhibit 2, #8 Attachment B to Exhibit 2)(Reisenweber, Erin)
December 7, 2023 Filing 11 RETURN RECEIPT as to #10 Order to Show Cause. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 12/4/2023. (ag)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE PETITION SHOULD NOT BE GRANTED. The Warden shall have twenty-eight (28) days from the date of this Order to show cause why the writ should not be granted. Attorney Christopher James Prezioso for H. Ray added. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 12/1/2023. (ag)(pro se PET cm rrr; AUSA US Mail and cm/ecf nef) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/1/2023: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (ag).
November 15, 2023 Filing 9 LETTER from Petitioner regarding filing fee. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmm)
November 14, 2023 Filing 8 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 500003416 (nmm)
November 6, 2023 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,. PER USPS website SERVICE ACCEPTED on 11/2/2023. (ag)
November 6, 2023 Filing 6 RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 Notice (Other). PER USPS website SERVICE ACCEPTED on 11/2/2023. (ag)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. It is further ORDERED that the petitioner shall pay the $5.00 filing fee within 21 days of service of this order. Failure to comply with this Order will result in this matter being dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 10/31/2023. (ag)(pro se PET cm rrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/31/2023: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (ag).
October 31, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. (ag)(pro se PET cm rrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/31/2023: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (ag).
October 31, 2023 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Gregory A. Waters. (Attachments: #1 Ledger Sheets, #2 Envelope)(ag)
October 31, 2023 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gregory A. Waters. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ag)
October 31, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against H. Ray, filed by Gregory A. Waters. (Attachments: #1 Ground 1 "A", #2 Ground 2 "B", #3 Ground 3 & 4 "C" "D", #4 Cover Letter, #5 Envelope)(ag)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waters v. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gregory A. Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mrs. H. Ray
Represented By: Christopher James Prezioso
Represented By: Erin K. Reisenweber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?