Gonzales v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Daniel Jason Gonzales
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 5:2023cv00345
Filed: December 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: James P Mazzone
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2024 Filing 11 RETURN RECEIPT as to #10 ORDER AND NOTICE GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES AND AFFIDAVIT. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 1/8/2024. (nmm)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER AND NOTICE GRANTING #7 PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES AND AFFIDAVIT. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 1/4/2024. (copy to pro se plaintiff via cm,rrr; copy to Fin. Deputy via email) (nmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/4/2024: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (nmm).
January 3, 2024 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Daniel Jason Gonzales (Attachments: #1 copies of ECF Nos #3 & #4 , #2 Envelope)(nmm)
January 3, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address by Daniel Jason Gonzales (no change) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nmm)
January 3, 2024 Filing 7 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Daniel Jason Gonzales. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nmm)
December 8, 2023 Filing 6 RETURN RECEIPT as to #2 Notice of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se In Federal Court, #3 Notice and #4 Notice of Deficient Pleading. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 12/6/2023. (nmm)
December 4, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan McKee (USA) on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (McKee (USA), Morgan)
December 1, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (copy to pro se plaintiff via cm,rrr) (nmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/1/2023: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (nmm).
December 1, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE re: #1 Complaint. (copy to pro se plaintiff via cm,rrr) (nmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/1/2023: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (nmm).
December 1, 2023 Filing 2 Notice of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se In Federal Court (copy to pro se plaintiff via cm,rrr) (nmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/1/2023: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (nmm).
December 1, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Daniel Jason Gonzales. (Attachments: #1 Order of Appeals Council, #2 Envelope)(nmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzales v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Jason Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Christopher James Prezioso
Represented By: Morgan McKee (USA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?