Morris et al v. Jupiter Aluminum Corportaion et al
Plaintiff: Danika Paige Morris and Joshua Wayne Morris
Defendant: Jupiter Aluminum Corportaion, George Reed and Michael Fair
Case Number: 5:2024cv00024
Filed: February 8, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2024 Filing 27 CLERK'S REMAND LETTER to Brooke County Circuit Clerk regarding #26 Order. (certified #26 order and docket sheet sent) (lmm)
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' #15 MOTION TO REMAND. #19 #20 #22 Motions are DENIED AS MOOT. The above-styled case is hereby REMANDED to the Circuit Court of Brooke County. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 4/1/24. (lmm)
March 27, 2024 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Danika Paige Morris, Joshua Wayne Morris. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Frankovitch, M.)
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER OF COURT granting #21 Motion. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 3/25/24. (lmm)
March 22, 2024 Filing 23 Memorandum in Support re #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM on Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by George Reed. (Taylor, Daniel)
March 22, 2024 Filing 22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM on Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by George Reed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Dismiss)(Taylor, Daniel)
March 22, 2024 Filing 21 Joint MOTION to Stay re #3 FirstOrder,, by Michael Fair, Jupiter Aluminum Corportaion. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Trischler, Clem)
March 20, 2024 Filing 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Memorandum in Support re 19 by Michael Fair, Jupiter Aluminum Corportaion. (Trischler, Clem)
March 20, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Michael Fair, Jupiter Aluminum Corportaion. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Trischler, Clem)
March 20, 2024 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Jupiter Aluminum Corportaion. (Trischler, Clem)
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: defendant Michael Fair's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint #10 and defendant George Reed's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint #12 are hereby DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 3/07/2024. (ag)
March 6, 2024 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM Brief in Support by Danika Paige Morris, Joshua Wayne Morris re #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Frankovitch, M.)
March 6, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Danika Paige Morris, Joshua Wayne Morris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Frankovitch, M.)
March 6, 2024 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Joshua Wayne Morris, Danika Paige Morris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Frankovitch, M.)
February 22, 2024 Filing 13 Memorandum in Support re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by George Reed. (Taylor, Daniel)
February 22, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by George Reed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Dismiss)(Taylor, Daniel)
February 22, 2024 Filing 11 Memorandum in Support re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Michael Fair. (Trischler, Clem)
February 22, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Michael Fair. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Trischler, Clem)
February 22, 2024 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Jupiter Aluminum Corportaion.(Trischler, Clem)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. Defendants Jupiter Aluminum Corporation and George shall file responsive pleadings no later than February 22, 2024. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 2/22/24. (lmm)
February 21, 2024 Filing 7 STIPULATION of the Parties by George Reed. (Taylor, Daniel)
February 21, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel P. Taylor on behalf of George Reed (Taylor, Daniel)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. Upon consideration of the Stipulation of the Parties, it is hereby, ORDERED, that Defendants Jupiter Aluminum Corporation and Michael Fair shall file responsive pleadings no later than February 22, 2024. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 2/20/2024. (ag)
February 16, 2024 Filing 4 STIPULATION extending time for responsive pleading by Michael Fair, Jupiter Aluminum Corportaion. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Trischler, Clem)
February 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 3/8/2024; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/22/2024; Initial Disclosures due by 4/5/2024. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 2/09/2024. (ag)
February 8, 2024 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jupiter Aluminum Corportaion. (Trischler, Clem)
February 8, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Brooke County, WV, (case number 24-C-3), filed by Jupiter Aluminum Corportaion. Filing Fee $405. Receipt #AWVNDC-3880407. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- Copies of All Pleadings and Other Papers Served upon Jupiter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ag)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris et al v. Jupiter Aluminum Corportaion et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danika Paige Morris
Represented By: Carl A. Frankovitch
Represented By: Frederick Alexander Risovich
Represented By: M. Eric Frankovitch
Represented By: Vincent S. Gurrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Wayne Morris
Represented By: Frederick Alexander Risovich
Represented By: Carl A. Frankovitch
Represented By: M. Eric Frankovitch
Represented By: Vincent S. Gurrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jupiter Aluminum Corportaion
Represented By: Clem C. Trischler
Represented By: Robert J. D'Anniballe, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Reed
Represented By: Daniel P. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Fair
Represented By: Robert J. D'Anniballe, Jr.
Represented By: Clem C. Trischler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?